EP1342660 - Clutch control, in particular for bicycle hub transmissions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SRAM Deutschland GmbH Postfach 1461 97404 Schweinfurt / DE | [2003/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steuer, Werner Karl-Fichtel-Strasse 35 97424 Schweinfurt / DE | 02 /
Kohaupt, Michael Vogtstrasse 12a 97469 Gochsheim / DE | 03 /
Pehse, Gunter Nordring 22 97464 Niederwerrn / DE | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/39] | Application number, filing date | 03003816.0 | 20.02.2003 | [2003/37] | Priority number, date | DE2002110201 | 07.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10210201 | [2003/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1342660 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1342660 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1342660 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62M11/16 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
B62M11/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2006/36] |
Former [2003/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuerung von Kupplungen, insbesondere von solchen für Antriebsnaben in Fahrrädern | [2003/37] | English: | Clutch control, in particular for bicycle hub transmissions | [2003/37] | French: | Système de contrôle pour des embrayages, notamment pour moyeu de bicyclette | [2003/37] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 30.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2006 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 06.01.2009 | [2009/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]AT166758B (STURMEY ARCHER GEARS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10 [A] 12,18; | [XA]US3257868 (HERBERT PREECE GORDON) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10 * figure - * [A] 12,18; | [A]US3555932 (SCHWERDHOFER HANS JOACHIM) [A] 1,12,18 * figure - *; | [DA]DE3432124 (SHIMANO INDUSTRIAL CO [JP]) [DA] 1,12,18 * figure - *; | [A]US5556354 (MEIER-BURKAMP GERHARD [DE]) [A] 1,12,18* figure - * | by applicant | DE3432124 |