EP1398501 - Device for damping pressure pulsations in a fluid system, particularly in a fuel system of a combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rembold, Helmut Oehringerstrasse 27 70435 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Lang, Klaus Gueglingweg 22 70439 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
Wuenning, Marcus Hohenfriedbergerstrasse 20 70499 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
Maier, Uwe Steineggerstrasse 11 75233 Tiefenbronn / DE | [2004/12] | Application number, filing date | 03003962.2 | 20.02.2003 | [2004/12] | Priority number, date | DE2002142590 | 13.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10242590 | [2004/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1398501 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1398501 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F04B11/00 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
F04B11/0033 (EP);
F04B11/0016 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/07] |
Former [2004/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Dämpfen von Druckpulsationen in einem Fluidsystem, insbesondere in einem Kraftstoffsystem einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2004/12] | English: | Device for damping pressure pulsations in a fluid system, particularly in a fuel system of a combustion engine | [2004/12] | French: | Dispositif pour amortir les pulsations de pression dans un système à fluide, en particulier dans un système à carburant d'un moteur à combustion | [2004/12] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/36] | 03.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.01.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.01.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1068261 (VERMOREL ETS) [A] 1 * the whole document * * page 3, column 2, line 8 - line 19 *; | [A]DE3152861 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * * page 4, line 11 - line 26 *; | [DA]DE19650784 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | DE19860784 |