EP1340875 - Actuator for locking device of wing of windows, doors or the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAYER & CO. Alpenstrasse 173 5020 Salzburg / AT | [2003/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maier, Franz Webereiweg 16 5400 Hallein/Rif / AT | 02 /
Bryant, Craig Lawrence, PR-Manager 53 Taylor Road, Snodland Kent ME6 5HJ / GB | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03004068.7 | 25.02.2003 | [2003/36] | Priority number, date | DE20022003170U | 28.02.2002 Original published format: DE 20203170 U | DE20022005634U | 11.04.2002 Original published format: DE 20205634 U | [2003/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1340875 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1340875 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E05C9/04 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
E05C9/04 (EP);
E05C9/24 (EP);
E05C9/063 (EP);
E05C9/1808 (EP);
E05C9/1858 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/36] | Title | German: | Verschlussgetriebe für Flügel von Fenstern, Türen und dergleichen | [2003/36] | English: | Actuator for locking device of wing of windows, doors or the same | [2003/36] | French: | Crémone-serrure pour battant de fenêtres, Portes ou similaires | [2003/36] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 19.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.10.2006 | CZ | 04.10.2006 | EE | 04.10.2006 | FI | 04.10.2006 | IE | 04.10.2006 | SI | 04.10.2006 | SK | 04.10.2006 | TR | 04.10.2006 | BG | 04.01.2007 | DK | 04.01.2007 | SE | 04.01.2007 | GR | 05.01.2007 | ES | 15.01.2007 | LU | 25.02.2007 | BE | 28.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | PT | 16.03.2007 | HU | 05.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 04.10.2006 | |
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
EE | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
LU | 25.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
EE | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | SI | 04.10.2006 | |
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/12] | SI | 04.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2603709 (GOMEZ DE LLARENA POU CARMELO) [X] 5,8,12 * the whole document * [Y] 10,11; | [YA]EP0683296 (WINKHAUS AUGUST GMBH CO KG [DE]) [Y] 10,11 * the whole document * [A] 1-5,7,9; | [A]GB2337073 (SECURISTYLE LTD [GB]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [XA]BE1013143 (BENELUX PAYMENT SYSTEMS IN HET [BE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 5,12,13 |