EP1375424 - Manufacturing method for a carbon nanomaterial, a manufacturing apparatus for a carbon nanomaterial, and manufacturing facility for a carbon nanomaterial [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | For all designated states OSAKA GAS CO., LTD. 1-2, Hiranomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | ||
For all designated states OSAKA GAS CO., LTD. 1-2, Hiranomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Setoguchi, Toshihiko, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. Nagasaki Res.&Dev. Ctr., 717-1-5, Fukahori-machi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | 02 /
Fujioka, Yuichi, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. Nagasaki Res.&Dev. Ctr., 717-1-5, Fukahori-machi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | 03 /
Tsuchiyama, Yoshihiko, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. Nagasaki Res.&Dev. Ctr., 717-1-5, Fukahori-machi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | 04 /
Yasutake, Akinori, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. Nagasaki Res.&Dev. Ctr., 717-1-5, Fukahori-machi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | 05 /
Noda, Matsuhei, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. Nagasaki Res.&Dev. Ctr., 717-1-5, Fukahori-machi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | 06 /
Kobayashi, Norihisa, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Nishida, Ryoichi Osaka Gas Co., Ltd., 1-2, Hiranomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 08 /
Nishino, Hitoshi Osaka Gas Co., Ltd., 1-2, Hiranomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 09 /
Okimi, Katsuhide Osaka Gas Co., Ltd., 1-2, Hiranomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 10 /
Hachiya, Akihiro Osaka Gas Co., Ltd., 1-2, Hiranomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03004208.9 | 25.02.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | JP20020186291 | 26.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002186291 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1375424 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C01B31/02, D01F9/127, D01F9/133 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B82B3/00 (KR);
C01B32/162 (EP,US);
B01J8/18 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/05 (KR);
D01F9/127 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00407 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00415 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2004/39] |
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren, Vorrichtung und Anlage zur Herstellung von Kohlenstoffnanomaterial | [2004/01] | English: | Manufacturing method for a carbon nanomaterial, a manufacturing apparatus for a carbon nanomaterial, and manufacturing facility for a carbon nanomaterial | [2004/01] | French: | Procédé, appareil et unité de production de nanomatériaux en carbone | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 26.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.02.2012 | 06.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/25] | 14.02.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.03.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP2003146635 [ ] (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD, et al); | [X] - WANG YAO ET AL, "Agglomerated carbon nanotubes and its mass production in a fluidized-bed reactor", PROCEEDINGS OF THE TSUKUBA SYMPOSIUM ON CARBON NANOTUBE IN COM (CNT10);TSUKUBA, JAPAN OCT 3-5 2001, Phys B Condens Matter;Physica B: Condensed Matter October 2002, (20011003), vol. 323, no. 1-4, pages 327 - 329, XP002254672 [X] 1-3,5,7-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0921-4526(02)01041-4 | [X] - LUO GUOHUA ET AL, "Catalysts effect on morphology of carbon nanotubes prepared by catalytic chemical vapor deposition in a nano-agglomerate bed", PROCEEDINGS OF THE TSUKUBA SYMPOSIUM ON CARBON NANOTUBE IN COM (CNT10);TSUKUBA, JAPAN OCT 3-5 2001, Phys B Condens Matter;Physica B: Condensed Matter October 2002, (20011003), vol. 323, no. 1-4, pages 314 - 317, XP002254673 [X] 1-3,5,7-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0921-4526(02)01039-6 | [X] - HERNADI K ET AL, "FE-CATALYZED CARBON NANOTUBE FORMATION", CARBON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1996), vol. 34, no. 10, ISSN 0008-6223, pages 1249 - 1257, XP000634342 [X] 1-3,5,7-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0008-6223(96)00074-7 | [PX] - SETOGUCHI, TOSHIHIKO ET AL, "Manufacture of carbon nano-materials and its apparatus", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 138:387279 CA, URL: STN, XP002254675 [PX] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - LIJIE ET AL., "Preparation of carbon nanofibers by the floating catalyst method", CARBON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, NEW YORK, NY, US, (2000), vol. 38, no. 14, ISSN 0008-6223, pages 1933 - 1937, XP004211939 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6223(00)00030-0 | [A] - CHEOL JIN LEE ET AL, "Large-scale production of aligned carbon nanotubes by the vapor phase growth method", CHEMICAL PHYSICS LETTERS, 13 JUNE 2002, ELSEVIER, NETHERLANDS, vol. 359, no. 1-2, ISSN 0009-2614, pages 109 - 114, XP002254674 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-2614(02)00648-6 | by applicant | - WANG YAO ET AL., "Agglomerated carbon nanotubes and its mass production in a fluidized-bed reactor", PROCEEDINGS OF THE TSUKUBA SYMPOSIUM ON CARBON NANOTUBE IN COM (CNT +=); TSUKUBA, JAPAN OCT: 3-5 2001, (20011003), vol. 323, no. 1-4, doi:doi:10.1016/S0921-4526(02)01041-4, pages 327 - 329, XP002254672 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0921-4526(02)01041-4 | - LUO GUOHUA ET AL., "Catalysts effect on morphology of carbon nanotubes prepared by catalytic chemical vapour deposition in a nano-agglomerate bed", TSUKUBA SYMPOSIUM ON CARBON NANOTUBE IN COM (CNT +=); TSUKUBA, JAPAN OCT: 3-5 2001, (20011003), vol. 323, no. 1-4, doi:doi:10.1016/S0921-4526(02)01039-6, pages 314 - 317, XP002254673 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0921-4526(02)01039-6 | - "Fe- catalysed nanotube formation", K. HERNADI ET AL., carbon, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, (1996), vol. 34, pages 1249 - 1257 |