EP1343022 - Procedure and system for detecting objects in the proximity of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH Stuttgarter Strasse 119 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2003/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuler, Thomas Wilhelm-Gille-Strasse 1 75446 Wiernsheim / DE | [2004/50] |
Former [2003/37] | 01 /
Schuler, Thomas Waldenserstrasse 42 75446 Wiernsheim / DE | Representative(s) | Vötsch, Reiner Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH Laiernstrasse 12 74319 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Vötsch, Reiner Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH 74319 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | ||
Former [2003/37] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03004370.7 | 03.03.2003 | [2003/37] | Priority number, date | DE2002110301 | 08.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10210301 | [2003/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1343022 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/93 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
G01S17/931 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/23] |
Former [2003/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Erfassung von Gegenständen im Nahbereich eines Fahrzeuges | [2003/37] | English: | Procedure and system for detecting objects in the proximity of a vehicle | [2003/37] | French: | Méthode et système pour la detection des objects à proximité d'un véhicule | [2003/37] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 11.03.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.06.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/23] | 04.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.04.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0358628 (TRANSITIONS RESEARCH CORP [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 5, line 10 - line 15 * * column 10, line 47 - column 13, line 4; figures 1A,1B,3A,3B * [Y] 4-12; | [XY]EP0479273 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 9, line 5 - line 30 * [Y] 3-12; | [XY]EP0617296 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 38 - page 6, line 12; figures 4-7 *[Y] 3-12; | [XY]US6038496 (DOBLER GUENTER [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 1 - line 54; figures 6,7 * [Y] 3-12; | [PX]EP1209485 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1,2,4-6 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-4 * |