EP1341159 - Speech information recognition device and speech information recognition method based on myoelectrical signal analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manabe, Hiroyuki NTT DoCoMo, Inc., 11-1 Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Hiraiwa, Akira NTT DoCoMo, Inc., 11-1 Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Sugimura, Toshiaki NTT DoCoMo, Inc., 11-1 Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/36] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03004462.2 | 27.02.2003 | [2003/36] | Priority number, date | JP20020054235 | 28.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002054235 | [2003/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1341159 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1341159 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/24, A61B5/0488 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
G10L15/24 (EP,US);
A61B5/389 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2003/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Sprachinformationserkennung unter Verwendung der Analyse myoelektrischer Signale | [2003/36] | English: | Speech information recognition device and speech information recognition method based on myoelectrical signal analysis | [2003/36] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de reconnaissance d'information de parole, basés sur l'analyse de signaux myo-électriques | [2003/36] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 04.03.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.04.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4212907 (DRESCHER RUEDIGER [DE]) [X] 1,6 * claim 1 *; | [X] - CHAN, ENGLEHART, HUDGINS, LOVELY, "Hidden Markov Model Classification of Myoelectric Signals in Speech", EMBS 2001, (20011025), pages 1727 - 1730, XP002239576 [X] 1,2,4,6 * page 1728, column R, line 8 - line 36; figure 1 * * abstract * | [X] - MORSE M S ET AL, "Use of myoelectric signals to recognize speech", IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY 11TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, (1989), pages 1793 - 1794, XP010088605 [X] 1,2,4,6 * abstract * * page 1794, column L, line 7 - line 19 * | [X] - MORSE M S ET AL, "Speech Recognition Using Myoelectric Signals With Neural Networks", ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY, 1991. VOL.13: 1991., PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE ORLANDO, FL, USA 31 OCT.-3 NOV. 1991, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19911031), ISBN 0-7803-0216-8, pages 1877 - 1878, XP010101949 [X] 1,3,6 * abstract * * page 1878, column L, lines 1-8 * | [A] - HOLZRICHTER J F ET AL, "SPEECH ARTICULATOR MEASUREMENTS USING LOW POWER EM-WAVE SENSORS", JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (1998), vol. 103, no. 1, ISSN 0001-4966, pages 622 - 625, XP000731768 [A] 1-6 * figures 1,3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.421133 |