EP1346629 - Method of grain production for heterozygous waxy sugary-2 maize [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brunob II B.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states BRUNOB II B.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation 1000 Uniqema Boulevard New Castle, Delaware 19720 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagle, Barry 1475 Sweet Saddle Court Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US | 02 /
Apel, Gary 8 Birchwood Lane St. Anne, Illinois 60964 / US | 03 /
Emling, Jospeh L. 14028 Woodlark Drive Fishers, Indiana 46038 / US | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/39] | Held, Stephan, Dipl.-Chem. Dr.rer.nat., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR, Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03004879.7 | 06.03.2003 | [2003/39] | Priority number, date | US20020091253 | 06.03.2002 Original published format: US 91253 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1346629 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1346629 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01H5/10, C08L3/02 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
A01H5/10 (EP,US);
A01H1/02 (EP,US);
A01H6/4684 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/39] | Title | German: | Methode zur Erzeugung von heterozygotem waxy sugary-2 Mais | [2003/39] | English: | Method of grain production for heterozygous waxy sugary-2 maize | [2003/39] | French: | Méthode de production de grains pour le mais hétérozygote waxy sugary-2 | [2003/39] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 25.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/30] | 14.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/30] | 09.05.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Appeal following examination | 15.07.2008 | Appeal received No. T2127/08 | 06.05.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant inadmissible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5954883 (NAGLE BARRY J [US], et al) [X] 9-11 * cited by the applicant; columns 1-5 * [Y] 1-8; | [Y] - PALAGYI A ET AL, "Maize hybrid seed production by the mutual random mating of the parental components.", CEREAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1996), vol. 24, no. 3, ISSN 0133-3720, pages 307 - 316, XP001153784 [Y] 1-8 * summary, Figure 1 * | Examination | WO9208341 | - CAMPBELL ET AL, "Dosage effect at the sugary-2 locus on maize starch structure and function", CEREAL CHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 71, no. 5, pages 464 - 468, XP008070174 |