EP1329748 - Optically anisotropic film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | For all designated states Consortium für elektrochemische Industrie GmbH Zielstattstrasse 20 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | ||
For all designated states Consortium für elektrochemische Industrie GmbH Zielstattstrasse 20 81379 München / DE | |||
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | ||
For all designated states Consortium für elektrochemische Industrie GmbH Zielstattstrasse 20 81379 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noguchi, Takanobu 370-49 Minaminakazuma Tsukuba-shi / JP | 02 /
Ohnishi, Toshihiro 7 Kasuga 3-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | 03 /
Morikawa, Michitaka 40-1 Kasuga 2-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | 04 /
Kuwabara, Masato 1-302, 2-13-1 Umezono Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki / JP | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/34] | 01 /
Noguchi, Takanobu 370-49 Minaminakazuma Tsukuba-shi / JP | ||
02 /
Ohnishi, Toshihiro 7 Kasuga 3-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | |||
03 /
Morikawa, Michitaka 40-1 Kasuga 2-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | |||
04 /
Kuwabara, Masato 13-10 Amakubo 2-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/30] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03004956.3 | 09.11.1995 | [2003/30] | Priority number, date | JP19940276570 | 10.11.1994 Original published format: JP 27657094 | JP19950083920 | 10.04.1995 Original published format: JP 8392095 | JP19950083921 | 10.04.1995 Original published format: JP 8392195 | JP19950174696 | 11.07.1995 Original published format: JP 17469695 | [2003/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1329748 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1329748 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, G02F1/1335, C09K19/02 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
G02F1/13363 (EP,US);
G02B1/00 (KR);
G02B5/3016 (EP,US);
G02F1/133633 (EP,US);
G02F1/133637 (EP,US);
G02F2203/21 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/30] | G02B5/30, G02F1/1335 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/30] | Title | German: | Optisch anisotropischer Film | [2003/30] | English: | Optically anisotropic film | [2003/30] | French: | Film optiquement anisotrope | [2003/30] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/30] | 16.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 09.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/24] | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/24] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95117691.6 / EP0712013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4810433 (TAKAYANAGI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * column W *; | [A]EP0423881 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-12 * column W *; | [A]EP0524028 (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12* column W *; | [A]EP0527231 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * column W *; | [A]EP0544015 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 54 - line 57 * * column 5, line 50 - line 58 * * column 6, line 1 - line 7 * * example - *; | [XA]EP0546748 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 22 - line 48 * * column 3, line 32 - line 47 * * column 4, line 20 - line 33 * * example - * [A] 2-12; | [DA]JPH05257013 (CASIO COMPUT CO LTD) [DA] 1-12 * column A; figure - *; | [A]GB2266599 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONIC DEVICES [KR]) [A] 1-12 * column W *; | [A]EP0587890 (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 7, line 10 - line 28 * * column 9, line 45 - line 53 * * column 10, line 55 - line 58 * * column 11, line 1 - line 7 *; | [A]EP0591536 (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]) [A] 1-12 * column 6, line 20 - line 38 * * column 10, line 12 - line 21 *; | [DA]EP0617111 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [DA] 1-12 * column W *; | [A]EP0620457 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, lines 32-49 * * column 5, line 37 - line 53 * * example - * |