EP1344648 - Inking device for a printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states manroland AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach/Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states manroland AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | ||
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simeth, Claus Postfach 13 01 07 63032 Offenbach / DE | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Stahl, Dietmar manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Stahl, Dietmar manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach am Main / DE | ||
Former [2003/38] | Stahl, Dietmar MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG, Abteilung RTB,Werk S Postfach 101264 63012 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 03005022.3 | 06.03.2003 | [2003/38] | Priority number, date | DE2002204255U | 16.03.2002 Original published format: DE 20204255 U | [2003/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1344648 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1344648 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41F31/15, B41F31/00 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
B41F31/004 (EP);
B41F31/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/38] | Title | German: | Farbwerk für eine Druckmaschine | [2003/38] | English: | Inking device for a printing machine | [2003/38] | French: | Dispositif d'encrage pour une machine à imprimer | [2003/38] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 18.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB499635 (HOE & CO R) [X] 1-4 * page 3, line 22 - line 27; figure 2 * [Y] 5,6; | [DY]DE19505625 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [DY] 5,6 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [X]DE312050 (VOGTLÄNDISCHE MASCHINENFABRIK) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 65 - page 2, line 1; figure . *; | [X]DE139802 (MÄURER) [X] 1 * page 1, line 1 - line 7; figure . *; | [X]US2155354 (AVERY TRUE M) [X] 1 * page 1, column R, line 48 - page 2, column L, line 2; figure 2 *; | [X]US1464925 (DUDLEY EDWARD F) [X] 1 * page 1, line 106 - page 2, line 7; figure 1 *; | [PX]WO02081219 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-5 * page 13, line 11 - line 24 * * page 16, line 14 - line 15 * * page 18, line 8 - line 9; figures 9,10 * | by applicant | DE3424721 |