EP1333700 - Method for frequency transposition in a hearing device and such a hearing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHONAK AG Laubisrütistrasse 28 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2003/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allegro, Silvia Pfannenstielstrasse 3 8618 Oetwil am See / CH | 02 /
Timms, Olegs Wehntalerstrasse 349 8046 Zürich / CH | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Schwäntenmos 14 8126 Zumikon / CH | [2003/32] | Application number, filing date | 03005047.0 | 06.03.2003 | [2003/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1333700 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1333700 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
H04R25/353 (EP);
G10L21/0364 (EP);
G10L2021/065 (EP);
H04R2225/43 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, LI [2004/24] |
Former [2003/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Frequenzunsetzung in einem Hörgerät und ein solches Hörgerät | [2003/32] | English: | Method for frequency transposition in a hearing device and such a hearing device | [2003/32] | French: | Procédé de transposition de fréquence dans une prothèse auditive et une telle prothèse auditive | [2003/32] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 12.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/53] | 07.07.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/53] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.04.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0054450 (LAFON JEAN CLAUDE) [YD] 1-3,5-9,11-15 * column 2, line 9 - column 2, line 55 * * column 1, line 17 - column 1, line 47 * * column 5, line 6 - column 5, line 9; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US4982434 (LENHARDT MARTIN L [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-9,11-15 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 31; figure 2 *; | [YDA]WO9914986 (UNIV IOWA RES FOUND [US]) [YD] 1-3,5-9,11-15 * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 4 * * page 5, line 2 - page 6, line 10; figure 1 * [A] 4,10; | [YDA]WO0075920 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [YD] 1-3,5-9,11-15 * page 10, line 9 - page 10, line 24 * * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 12 * * page 8, line 17 - page 8, line 21 * [A] 4,10; | [A] - XUEDONG HUANG, ALEX ACERO, HSIAO-WUEN HON, Spoken Language Processing, UPPER SADDLE RIVER, NEW JERSEY, PRENTICE HALL PTR, (2001), ISBN 0-13-022616-5, XP002248543 [A] 4,10 * page 29, line 1 - page 36, line 8 * |