EP1345213 - Magnetic recording medium and method and apparatus for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Kiyoshi 2-1-14, Ayukawa Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0831 / JP | 02 /
Imamura, Junichi 333, Oshibuchi Tsuyama-shi, Okayama 708-0865 / JP | 03 /
Imai, Tomofusa 308-9, Hisatsune, Nagi-cho Katsuta-gun, Okayama 708-1311 / JP | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/38] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03005414.2 | 13.03.2003 | [2003/38] | Priority number, date | JP20020071875 | 15.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002071875 | [2003/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1345213 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1345213 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/72, G11B5/84, C23C4/06, C23C14/06 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
C23C16/26 (EP,US);
C23C16/545 (EP,US);
G11B5/725 (EP,US);
G11B5/7266 (EP,US);
G11B5/8408 (EP,US);
G11B5/78 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/24] |
Former [2003/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Magnetische Aufzeichnungsmedium und Verfahren und Gerät zur Herstellung desselben | [2003/38] | English: | Magnetic recording medium and method and apparatus for manufacturing the same | [2003/38] | French: | Support d'enrégistrement magnétique et méthode et appareil pour la fabrication du même | [2003/38] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 21.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0432536 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * page 4, lines 1-14 * * page 4, lines 42-46 * * page 8, line 31 - page 9, line 22 * * page 13, lines 1-5 *; | [A]EP0580164 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, lines 52-57 * * page 3, lines 22-35; figure 1 * * page 11, lines 7-12 *; | [A]US5589263 (UEDA HIDEYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 6, line 40 - column 9, line 8; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US5612134 (OKITA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 7, line 10 - column 11, line 10 *; | [A]US6001431 (ITOH KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 6* column 8, line 53 - column 9, line 13; figure 6 * |