EP1322122 - Image predictive decoding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boon, Chong Seng Oosakafu Moriguchishi, Toudachou 4-2-5 Shatomorioka 416, 570-0014 / JP | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 03005476.1 | 07.04.1998 | [2003/26] | Priority number, date | JP19970090659 | 09.04.1997 Original published format: JP 9065997 | [2003/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1322122 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1322122 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/46, H04N7/26, H04N7/50 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
H04N19/00 (EP,US);
H04N19/51 (KR);
H04N19/105 (EP,US);
H04N19/136 (EP,US);
H04N19/146 (EP,US);
H04N19/17 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (EP,US);
H04N19/186 (EP,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,US);
H04N19/503 (EP,US);
H04N19/553 (EP,US);
H04N19/577 (EP,US);
H04N19/587 (EP,US);
H04N19/59 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/26] | Title | German: | Prädiktives Bilddekodierungsverfahren | [2003/26] | English: | Image predictive decoding method | [2003/26] | French: | Méthode prédictive de décodage d'image | [2003/26] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 25.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00117974.6 / EP1065883 | EP98106351.4 / EP0871336 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/39] | IT | 14.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05137130 ; | [A]JPH08307875 ; | [A]JPH08154247 ; | [X]GB2296839 (HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS IND [KR]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 2, line 30 - page 5, line 8 *; | [PA]US5706053 (URANO TAKASHI [JP]) [PA] 1 * abstract ** column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 63 *; | US5717441 [ ] (SERIZAWA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [ ] * abstract * * column 2, line 27 - column 2, line 54 *; | US5748784 [ ] (SUGIYAMA KENJI [JP]); | [X] - MUSMANN H G ET AL, "OBJECT-ORIENTED ANALYSIS-SYNTHESIS CODING OF MOVING IMAGES", SIGNAL PROCESSING: IMAGE COMMUNICATION,XX,XX, (19890101), vol. 1, pages 117 - 138, XP000519208 [X] 1 * abstract * * page 117, column L, paragraph 1 - page 121, column L, line 3 * * page 128, column R, line 14 - page 132, column L, line 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(89)90005-2 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 017, no. 521, Database accession no. (E - 1435), & JP05137130 A 00000000 (VICTOR CO.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08307875 A 19961122 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, & JP08154247 A 19960611 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |