EP1344585 - Hydroelastic deep drawing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dieffenbacher GmbH + Co. KG Heilbronner Strasse 20 75031 Eppingen / DE | [2008/19] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Dieffenbacher GmbH + Co. KG Heilbronner Strasse 20 75031 Eppingen / DE | ||
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Dieffenbacher GmbH & Co. KG Heilbronner Strasse 75031 Eppingen / DE | ||
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik J. Dieffenbacher GmbH & Co. Heilbronnerstrasse 1 75031 Eppingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pahl, Klaus-Jürgen Birkenweg 21 75015 Bretten / DE | 02 /
Bielfeldt, Friedrich B Rauchäckerstr. 1 82396 Pähl am Ammersee / DE | [2003/44] |
Former [2003/38] | 01 /
Pahl, Klaus-Jürgen Am Rosenhang 10 75056 Sulzfeld / DE | ||
02 /
Bielfeldt, Friedrich B Rauchäckerstr. 1 82396 Pähl am Ammersee / DE | Representative(s) | Hartdegen, Anton Angerfeldstrasse 12 82205 Gilching / DE | [2003/38] | Application number, filing date | 03005517.2 | 11.03.2003 | [2003/38] | Priority number, date | DE2002110573 | 11.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10210573 | [2003/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1344585 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1344585 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | [2005/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1344585 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B21D24/08 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
B21D24/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/38] | Title | German: | Hydroelastische Tiefzieheinrichtung | [2003/38] | English: | Hydroelastic deep drawing device | [2003/38] | French: | Dispositif d'emboutissage profond hydroélastique | [2003/38] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 12.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.05.2008 | CZ | 07.05.2008 | EE | 07.05.2008 | FI | 07.05.2008 | IE | 07.05.2008 | NL | 07.05.2008 | RO | 07.05.2008 | SI | 07.05.2008 | SK | 07.05.2008 | TR | 07.05.2008 | BG | 07.08.2008 | SE | 07.08.2008 | GR | 08.08.2008 | PT | 07.10.2008 | HU | 08.11.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 07.05.2008 | |
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
GR | 08.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
HU | 08.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 07.05.2008 | |
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
GR | 08.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 07.05.2008 | |
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 07.05.2008 | |
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | CZ | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | FI | 07.05.2008 | |
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 07.05.2008 | |
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 07.05.2008 | |
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 07.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3022844 (UNIPLANUNG GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [DA]DE3333687 (UNIPLANUNG GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]DE4112656 (MUELLER WEINGARTEN MASCHF [DE]); | [A]DE4016838 (SMG SUEDDEUTSCHE MASCHINENBAU [DE]); | [X]DE4100206 (DIEFFENBACHER GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4104136 (DIEFFENBACHER GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1-8 * column 4, line 9 - column 4, line 67; claim - *; | [A]DE19718841 (MUELLER WEINGARTEN MASCHF [DE]); | [A]US6006578 (REITTER ERHARDT [DE]) | Examination | DE19641411 |