EP1375917 - Electric pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jacquot, Laurent Maxima Roland 20, Chemin de las palabas 63350 Toulouges / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Jacquot Laurent Maxima Roland 20, Chemin de las palabas 63350 Toulouges / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Sugrañes, S.L.P. Calle Provenza 304 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | SUGRANES - VERDONCES - FERREGÜELA 304 Calle Provenza 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 03005611.3 | 12.03.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | ES20020001441 | 24.06.2002 Original published format: ES 200201441 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1375917 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1375917 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04D15/00, F04B23/02 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
F04D15/0016 (EP);
F04B13/02 (ES)
|
Former IPC [2004/01] | F04B23/02 | Designated contracting states | ES, FR [2005/43] |
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrisch angetriebene Pumpe | [2004/01] | English: | Electric pump | [2004/01] | French: | Pompe électrique | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 08.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/21] | 25.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.09.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB884234 (SIMON HANDLING ENG LTD); | [X]US3582229 (FELLENBERG JOST EDUARD VON); | [X]EP0394140 (ICF SARL [FR]) |