EP1344650 - Recording apparatus with carriage having detachable cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Nobuyuki 2-24-105, Saikujo-cho 2-chome Nara-shi, Nara / JP | 02 /
Miyamoto, Shigeo Sky Manshon 205, 19-1, Kawarado-cho Nara-shi, Nara / JP | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03005830.9 | 14.03.2003 | [2003/38] | Priority number, date | JP20020072291 | 15.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002072291 | JP20020338176 | 21.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002338176 | [2003/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1344650 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1344650 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
B41J2/17553 (EP,US);
B41J2/1752 (EP,US);
B41J2/17526 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR [2004/24] |
Former [2003/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsgerät mit einem Schlitten mit einer entfernbaren Kartusche | [2003/38] | English: | Recording apparatus with carriage having detachable cartridge | [2003/38] | French: | Dispositif d'enregistrement comportant un chariot avec une cartouche amovible | [2003/38] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 04.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5392063 (RHOADS W WISTAR [US]); | [A]EP0997297 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-15 *; | [A]WO0154911 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 2-4 * | by applicant | US5392063 |