EP1464220 - Sinker casting mold and casting method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/41] | Sinker casting mold | ||
[2006/21] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WATER GREMLIN COMPANY 1610 Whitaker Avenue White Bear Lake, MN 55110 / US | [2004/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ratte, Robert W. 18 Oriole Lane North Oaks, MN 55127 / US | 02 /
Clift, Timothy J. 8064 Wood Duck Trail Lino Lakes Minnesota 55127 / US | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/41] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03006740.9 | 25.03.2003 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1464220 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01K95/00, B22D21/00, B22D17/22, B22C9/06 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
A01K95/005 (EP);
B22C9/062 (EP);
B22D17/22 (EP);
B22D21/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Title | German: | Giessform und Giessverfahren für Sinkgewichte | [2006/21] | English: | Sinker casting mold and casting method | [2006/21] | French: | Moule de coulée et procédé pour poids à pêche | [2006/21] |
Former [2004/41] | Giessform für Sinkgewichte | ||
Former [2004/41] | Sinker casting mold | ||
Former [2004/41] | Moule de coulée pour poids à pêche | Examination procedure | 10.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/13] | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4045536 (WALLACE JOHN F) [A] 1,10,19 * abstract * * figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0658305 (ZIELOWSKI WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1,10,19 * abstract *; | [A]US5782285 (TRICKEL JERRY E [US], et al) [A] 1,10,19 * abstract ** column 2, line 17 - column 7, line 19; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US6325136 (RATTE ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1,10,19 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - column 6, line 63; figures 3-5 * |