EP1348618 - Easy shifting transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRP-Rotax GmbH & Co. KG Welser Strasse 32 4623 Gunskirchen / AT | [2005/28] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states Bombardier-Rotax GmbH & Co. KG Welser Strasse 32 4623 Gunskirchen / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Korenjak, Norbert Kapellenweg 13 4651 Stadl Paura / AT | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/27] | Harringer, Thomas BRP-Rotax GmbH & Co. KG Welser Strasse 32 4623 Gunskirchen / AT | ||
Former [2003/40] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03006837.3 | 27.03.2003 | [2003/40] | Priority number, date | US20020367726P | 28.03.2002 Original published format: US 367726 P | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1348618 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1348618 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1348618 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62M25/00, B62M25/02, F16H63/14 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
B62M11/04 (EP,US);
B62M25/00 (EP,US);
F16H63/14 (EP,US);
F16H63/16 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20018 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2133 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/40] | B62M25/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/40] | Title | German: | Getriebe mit einfacher Schaltung | [2003/40] | English: | Easy shifting transmission | [2003/40] | French: | Transmission à changement de vitesse facile | [2003/40] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 18.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.09.2006 | CH | 06.09.2006 | CY | 06.09.2006 | CZ | 06.09.2006 | EE | 06.09.2006 | FI | 06.09.2006 | FR | 06.09.2006 | IT | 06.09.2006 | LI | 06.09.2006 | NL | 06.09.2006 | RO | 06.09.2006 | SI | 06.09.2006 | SK | 06.09.2006 | TR | 06.09.2006 | BG | 06.12.2006 | DK | 06.12.2006 | SE | 06.12.2006 | GR | 07.12.2006 | ES | 17.12.2006 | PT | 19.02.2007 | HU | 07.03.2007 | GB | 27.03.2007 | IE | 27.03.2007 | LU | 27.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | BE | 06.09.2006 | |
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
CY | 06.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
EE | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
FR | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
GB | 27.03.2007 | ||
IE | 27.03.2007 | ||
LU | 27.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | BE | 06.09.2006 | |
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
EE | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
FR | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
GB | 27.03.2007 | ||
IE | 27.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | BE | 06.09.2006 | |
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
EE | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
GB | 27.03.2007 | ||
IE | 27.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | BE | 06.09.2006 | |
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
GB | 27.03.2007 | ||
IE | 27.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | BE | 06.09.2006 | |
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
GB | 27.03.2007 | ||
IE | 27.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | BE | 06.09.2006 | |
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
IE | 27.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | BE | 06.09.2006 | |
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | BE | 06.09.2006 | |
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | BE | 06.09.2006 | |
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | BE | 06.09.2006 | |
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE907249 (ULRICH POHL) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2826040 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4491031 (OOKA YUZO [JP]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0869301 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4510820 |