EP1353255 - Apparatus for dosing gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Technology Services GmbH 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Bayer Technology Services GmbH 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prinz, Thomas, Dr. Immenweg 33 51371 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
Stenger, Matthias, Dr. Grabenstrasse 21 40789 Monheim / DE | 03 /
Jähn, Peter Strassburger Strasse 23b 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
Düster, Ralf Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 7A 52349 Düren / DE | [2003/42] | Application number, filing date | 03006882.9 | 31.03.2003 | [2003/42] | Priority number, date | DE2002116143 | 12.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10216143 | [2003/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1353255 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G05D16/20, G01F1/74, G01F1/86, G01F1/88 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
G05D16/2013 (EP,US);
Y02E60/32 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7761 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Dosierung von Gasen | [2003/42] | English: | Apparatus for dosing gases | [2003/42] | French: | Dispositif pour le dosage des gaz | [2003/42] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 24.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/43] | 23.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4858583 (SONNTAG BRUNO [DE]) [A] 1* abstract * |