EP1350421 - Pump unit and working vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG. CO., LTD. 18-1, Inadera 2-Chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661-0981 / JP | [2006/23] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Kanzaki Kokyukoki MFG. Co., Ltd. 18-1, Inadera 2-Chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0981 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohashi, Ryota, Kanzaki Kokyukoki Mfg. Co., Ltd. 18-1, Inadera 2-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0981 / JP | 02 /
Sumomozawa, Hironori, Kanzaki Kokyukoki Mfg Co Ltd 18-1, Inadera 2-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0981 / JP | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03006899.3 | 31.03.2003 | [2003/41] | Priority number, date | JP20020101100 | 03.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002101100 | JP20020112128 | 15.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002112128 | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1350421 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1350421 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/68, B60K17/10 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
A01D34/6806 (EP,US);
B60K17/10 (EP,US);
B60K17/105 (EP,US);
B60K17/28 (EP,US);
B60K25/00 (EP,US);
B60K25/02 (EP,US);
B60K25/06 (EP,US);
F04B1/22 (EP,US);
F15B11/17 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/223 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20546 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20561 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20576 (EP,US);
F15B2211/214 (EP,US);
F15B2211/27 (EP,US);
F15B2211/40507 (EP,US);
F15B2211/40515 (EP,US);
F15B2211/40584 (EP,US);
F15B2211/41536 (EP,US);
F15B2211/423 (EP,US);
F15B2211/473 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/27] |
Former [2003/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pump- und Arbeitsfahrzeug | [2003/41] | English: | Pump unit and working vehicle | [2003/41] | French: | Pompe et véhicule de travail | [2003/41] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 09.04.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.08.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, RO | 08.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05028236.7 / EP1642487 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.05.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4882940 (YAMAOKA KOJIRO [JP], et al) [A] 9* figure 11 *; | [Y]US6098740 (ABEND ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 10,12,22-24 * column 4, line 21 - line 29; figure 12 *; | [XY]JP2002096650 (KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-8,11,13-16,19,20 * figures 1-3 * [Y] 10,12,17,18,22-24; | [XPY]US2002043057 (SHIBA KENJI [JP], et al) [XP] 1-8,11,13-16,19,20 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0016] - [0018] - [0135] - [0141] - [0163] , [0167]; figures 1,10,11,13 * [YP] 10,12,17,18,22-24 | by applicant | US4395865 | US5809756 |