EP1468701 - Challenge device, especially for testing the penetration properties of a sterilant in sterilising processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2009 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaiser, Ulrich, Dr. Feldstrasse 14 D-61479 Glashütten / DE | [2004/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Walkenhorst, Andreas Tergau & Walkenhorst Intellectual Property GmbH Lurgiallee 12 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | Walkenhorst, Andreas Tergau & Pohl Eschersheimer Landstrasse 26 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 03007122.9 | 28.03.2003 | [2004/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1468701 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1468701 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/28, C12Q1/22, G01N31/22 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
G01N31/226 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2/28 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/43] | Title | German: | Prüfkörper, insbesondere zur Überprüfung der Penetrationseigenschaften eines Sterilisiermittels in Sterilisationsprozessen | [2004/43] | English: | Challenge device, especially for testing the penetration properties of a sterilant in sterilising processes | [2004/43] | French: | Dispositif de test, en particulier pour évaluer les proprietés de pénétration d'un stérilisant dans des procédés de stérilisation | [2004/43] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 14.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.06.2005 | EE | 08.06.2005 | FI | 08.06.2005 | RO | 08.06.2005 | SI | 08.06.2005 | SK | 08.06.2005 | BG | 08.09.2005 | GR | 08.09.2005 | HU | 09.12.2005 | [2009/24] |
Former [2009/02] | CY | 08.06.2005 | |
EE | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
RO | 08.06.2005 | ||
SI | 08.06.2005 | ||
SK | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
HU | 09.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/41] | EE | 08.06.2005 | |
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
RO | 08.06.2005 | ||
SI | 08.06.2005 | ||
SK | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
HU | 09.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/12] | EE | 08.06.2005 | |
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
SI | 08.06.2005 | ||
SK | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
HU | 09.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | FI | 08.06.2005 | |
SI | 08.06.2005 | ||
SK | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 08.06.2005 | |
SI | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 08.06.2005 | |
SI | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 08.06.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8700471U (C.S.P. VERSLOOT) [A] 1-10 * page 6 - page 8; figures 1-3 *; | [AD]EP0628814 (KAISER ULRICH DR [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * page 2, line 54 - page 4, line 40; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9712637 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 8, line 12 - page 22, line 5; figures 1-12 *; | [A]DE29811381U (SECUNDUS MEDIZINISCHE KONTROLL [DE]) [A] 1-10* page 1 - page 10; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0882456 (SECUNDUS MEDIZINISCHE KONTROLL [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 8, line 21 - column 14, line 12; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US5872004 (BOLSEN KATHRYN A [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 34; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0982039 (MELAGAPPARATE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 26; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1084714 (SECUNDUS MEDIZINISCHE KONTROLL [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 48 - column 5, line 46; figure 1 * |