EP1355387 - Electrical connector assembly on a fixed vehicle body part and method for building such an electrical connector assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Electronics AMP GmbH Ampèrestrasse 12-14 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2010/50] |
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics AMP GmbH Ampèrestrasse 12-14 64625 Bensheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulte, Marcus Am Centgericht 4 64646 Heppenheim / DE | 02 /
Seipel, Volker Darmstädter Strasse 49 a 64404 Bickenbach / DE | 03 /
Koperly, Ayad Robert-Bosch-Strasse 36 a 64625 Bensheim / DE | 04 /
Demuth, Ulrich Dellenweg 8 64711 Erbach / DE | 05 /
Spielvogel, Michael Wellsring 72 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | 06 /
Schmidt, Heinrich An der Steinkaute 28 63225 Langen / DE | [2003/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03007442.1 | 03.04.2003 | [2003/43] | Priority number, date | EP20020008646 | 17.04.2002 Original published format: EP 02008646 | [2003/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1355387 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1355387 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/74 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
H01R13/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/32] |
Former [2004/29] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrischer Steckverbinderanordnung an einem ortsfesten Karosserieteil eines Kraftfahrzeugs und Verfahren zur Bildung einer solchen elektrischen Steckverbindung | [2003/43] | English: | Electrical connector assembly on a fixed vehicle body part and method for building such an electrical connector assembly | [2003/43] | French: | Assemblage de connecteur électrique sur une pièce fixe de carrosserie de véhicule et procédé pour la formation d'un tel assemblage de connecteur électrique | [2003/43] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 23.04.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.08.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.06.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0192254 (CONTACT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5,11,17 * page 6, paragraph 2; figures 1-5 *; | [DA]WO8911171 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [DA] 1,17* abstract *; | [A]DE4040748 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [A] 1,12-17 * column 3, line 56 - line 63; figures 1-10 *; | [X]EP0801442 (HARNESS SYST TECH RES LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,17,18 * column 7, line 27 - line 37; figures 1-18 *; | [A]EP0896397 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3,6,7,17 * column 13, paragraph 3; figures 1-20 * |