EP1464925 - Method for the production of an actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FESTO AG & Co. KG Ruiter Strasse 82 73734 Esslingen / DE | [2008/28] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Festo AG & Co Ruiter Strasse 82 73734 Esslingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiessling, Albert Haldenstrasse 21 71263 Weil der Stadt / DE | 02 /
Reininger, Thomas Paulinenstrasse 17 73249 Wernau / DE | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Partnerschaft mbB Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Bregenzer, Michael, et al Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03007475.1 | 05.04.2003 | [2004/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1464925 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/48 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
F15B15/2892 (EP,US);
F15B15/2861 (EP,US);
F15B15/2884 (EP,US);
G01D5/485 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49016 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49144 (EP,US);
Y10T29/494 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/26] |
Former [2004/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Aktor-Vorrichtung | [2004/41] | English: | Method for the production of an actuator | [2004/41] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'actionneur | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 07.04.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.08.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 30.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3898555 (TELLERMAN JACOB) [A] 1-4,8-16,18,19 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9315378 (MTS SYSTEM CORP [US]) [Y] 1-4,8-16,18,19 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5545984 (GLODEN MICHAEL L [US], et al) [A] 5-7,17* column 6, line 56 - line 67 *; | [Y]US5717330 (MOREAU TERENCE J [CA], et al) [Y] 1-4,8-16,18,19 * column 1, line 38 - line 40 * * column 3, line 49 - column 6, line 51 * | by applicant | WO9315378 | US5717330 |