EP1359039 - Convertible vehicle with at least two rigid roof elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilhelm Karmann GmbH Karmannstrasse 1 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [2007/12] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Wilhelm Karmann GmbH Karmannstrasse 1 D-49084 Osnabrück / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eichholz, Stefan Alter Postweg 33 49163 Bohmte / DE | 02 /
Budzinski, Thorsten Holbeinstrasse 22 49252 Lengerich / DE | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Pott, Ulrich, et al Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Grosshandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/45] | Pott, Ulrich, et al Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Grosshandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 03007483.5 | 07.04.2003 | [2003/45] | Priority number, date | DE20021017917 | 23.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10217917 | [2003/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1359039 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1359039 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/12] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1359039 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/14 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
B60J7/205 (EP,US);
B60J7/146 (EP,US);
B60J7/202 (EP,US);
B60J7/208 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/45] |
Former [2003/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Cabriolet-Fahrzeug mit zumindest zwei starren Dachteilen | [2003/45] | English: | Convertible vehicle with at least two rigid roof elements | [2003/45] | French: | Véhicule convertible comprenant au moins deux parties de toit rigides | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.07.2007
ADMISSIBLE Edscha Cabrio-Dachsysteme GmbH Scharwächterstrasse 5 94491 Hengersberg / DE Opponent's representative Dammertz, Ulrich, et al, et al Bonnekamp & Sparing Patentanwaltskanzlei Goltsteinstrasse 19 D 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.07.2007
ADMISSIBLE Edscha Cabrio-Dachsysteme GmbH Scharwächterstrasse 5 94491 Hengersberg / DE Opponent's representative Dammertz, Ulrich, et al, et al Bonnekamp & Sparing Patentanwaltskanzlei Goltsteinstrasse 19 D 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | 29.01.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.07.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.12.2008 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 04.08.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.03.2007 | CZ | 21.03.2007 | DK | 21.03.2007 | EE | 21.03.2007 | FI | 21.03.2007 | IE | 21.03.2007 | NL | 21.03.2007 | RO | 21.03.2007 | SI | 21.03.2007 | SK | 21.03.2007 | TR | 21.03.2007 | AT | 07.04.2007 | LU | 07.04.2007 | BE | 30.04.2007 | CH | 30.04.2007 | LI | 30.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | BG | 21.06.2007 | SE | 21.06.2007 | GR | 22.06.2007 | ES | 02.07.2007 | PT | 21.08.2007 | HU | 22.09.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
AT | 07.04.2007 | ||
LU | 07.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 21.06.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
AT | 07.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | CZ | 21.03.2007 | |
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
AT | 07.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 21.03.2007 | |
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
AT | 07.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 21.03.2007 | |
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
AT | 07.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 21.03.2007 | |
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 21.03.2007 | |
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | CZ | 21.03.2007 | |
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | CZ | 21.03.2007 | |
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 21.03.2007 | |
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 21.03.2007 | |
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | FI | 21.03.2007 | |
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 21.03.2007 | |
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | FI | 21.03.2007 | |
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 21.03.2007 | |
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4326329 (WEBASTO KAROSSERIESYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4435222 (WEBASTO KAROSSERIESYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0835780 (KARMANN GMBH W [DE], et al) [A] 1,7 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]DE19846006 (EDSCHA CABRIO VERDECKSYS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7 * figures 1,3,4 *; | [X]DE19957427 (WEBASTO VEHICLE SYS INT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10108493 (EDSCHA CABRIO DACHSYS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7,8 * figures 1-13 *; | [A]DE10020663 (EDSCHA CABRIO VERDECKSYS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* figures 1-3 * | Opposition | DE29620468U | DE19714104 | DE10006296 |