EP1375346 - Evacuation slide having trapezoidal outline [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation 4 Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation 4 Coliseum Centre, 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, North Carolina 28217-4578 / US | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation 25401 N. Central Avenue Phoenix, AZ 85027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Danielson, Leibert 8885 E. Conieson Drive Scottsdale, Arizona 85260 / US | 02 /
Horwarth, William, J. 190 S. Pineview Place Chandler, Arizona 85226 / US | 03 /
Meng, Haiwen 4450 East Dry Creek Road Phoenix, Arizona 85044 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 03007599.8 | 02.04.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | US20020177190 | 21.06.2002 Original published format: US 177190 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1375346 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1375346 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B64D25/14, A62B1/20 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
B64D25/14 (EP,US);
A62B1/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2006/24] |
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Notrutsche mit trapezoidalem Umriss | [2004/01] | English: | Evacuation slide having trapezoidal outline | [2004/01] | French: | Toboggan d'évacuation ayant un contour trapézoidal | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 14.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/04] | 02.08.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.05.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3973645 (DIX EARL E, et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 12; figures 2-4 * [Y] 4,8; | [Y]US4018321 (FISHER JOHN MELVIN) [Y] 4,8 * the whole document *; | [X]US4684079 (MILLER RALPH A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7* the whole document * | by applicant | US3811534 | US5102070 | US5820773 |