EP1326120 - Head-mounted image display device and data processing apparatus including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [2010/08] |
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-Chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasukawa, Masaaki c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392 / JP | 02 /
Kinebuchi, Tadashi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392 / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Noriko c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392 / JP | 04 /
Yoneno, Kunio c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392 / JP | 05 /
Uchiyama, Syoichi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392 / JP | 06 /
Karasawa, Joji c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392 / JP | 07 /
Kamakura, Hiroshi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392 / JP | [2003/28] | Representative(s) | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London WC1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 03007862.0 | 12.08.1994 | [2003/28] | Priority number, date | JP19930200863 | 12.08.1993 Original published format: JP 20086393 | JP19930288459 | 17.11.1993 Original published format: JP 28845993 | JP19930290952 | 19.11.1993 Original published format: JP 29095293 | JP19930290953 | 19.11.1993 Original published format: JP 29095393 | JP19930290955 | 19.11.1993 Original published format: JP 29095593 | JP19930298478 | 29.11.1993 Original published format: JP 29847893 | JP19930328586 | 24.12.1993 Original published format: JP 32858693 | JP19930328594 | 24.12.1993 Original published format: JP 32859493 | [2003/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1326120 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1326120 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1326120 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, // G06F3/01 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
G06F3/014 (EP,US);
G02B27/017 (EP,US);
G02B27/0176 (EP,US);
G06F1/1615 (EP,US);
G06F1/1616 (EP,US);
G06F1/163 (EP,US);
G06F1/1632 (EP,US);
G06F1/1637 (EP,US);
G06F1/1639 (EP,US);
G06F1/1654 (EP,US);
G06F1/1656 (EP,US);
G06F1/1684 (EP,US);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06F3/013 (EP,US);
H04N5/64 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0132 (EP,US);
G02B2027/014 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0141 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0156 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0187 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0198 (EP,US);
H04N5/7491 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/28] | G02B27/01 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/28] | Title | German: | Am Kopf montierte Bildanzeige- und eine hiermit ausgestattete Datenverarbeitungsvorrichtung | [2003/28] | English: | Head-mounted image display device and data processing apparatus including the same | [2003/28] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage d'images monté sur la tête associé à un système de traitement de données | [2003/28] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 03.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94922367.1 / EP0714043 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 13.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH05100192 ; | [Y]GB2206421 (MARCONI GEC LTD) [Y] 1,2 * page 6, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph 3; figure 2 *; | [A]US5034809 (KATOH HIDEAKI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 56 - line 67; figures 4a,4b,4c *; | [Y]EP0479605 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1,2 * page 3, column 47 - column 54 *; | [A] - "MACHINE A ECRIRE ELECTRONIQUE COMPACTE CANON, AP15O MODE D'EMPLOI", CANON MACHINE A ECRIRE ELECTRONIQUE, XX, XX, (1985), pages 13 - 18,47,48, XP002302602 [A] 1 * page 18 : "Selecteur de soulignement automatique" * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930817), vol. 0174, no. 48, Database accession no. (P - 1594), & JP5100192 A 19930423 (SONY CORP) [DA] * abstract * |