EP1352786 - Electronic instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-0063 / JP | [2006/13] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-0063 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tobishima, Yasuyuki Pioneer Corp., Kawagoe Kojo, 25-1 Aza Nishimachi Yamada, Kawagoe-shi, Saitama 350-0822 / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Yasuharu Pioneer Corp., Kawagoe Kojo, 25-1 Aza Nishimachi Yamada, Kawagoe-shi, Saitama 350-0822 / JP | 03 /
Shimizu, Akira Pioneer Corp., Kawagoe Kojo, 25-1 Aza Nishimachi Yamada, Kawagoe-shi, Saitama 350-0822 / JP | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03008006.3 | 10.04.2003 | [2003/42] | Priority number, date | JP20020109265 | 11.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002109265 | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1352786 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1352786 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | [2004/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1352786 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/02, H04B1/08 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
B60R11/0211 (EP,US);
B60R11/0205 (EP,US);
H04B1/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/33] |
Former [2003/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronisches Gerät | [2003/42] | English: | Electronic instrument | [2003/42] | French: | Appareil électronique | [2003/42] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 10.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0507987 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4* page 2, line 1 - line 17; figure - *; | [A]EP0658011 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 3 - line 47; figure - *; | [A]US5510957 (TAKAGI KATSUHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 4; figure - *; | [A]US5610376 (TAKAGI KATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 32 - column 4, line 38; figure - * |