EP1359491 - Methods for remotely changing a communications password [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | ||
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | ||
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Microsoft One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ayyagari, Arun 4912 NE 88th Street Seattle, Washington 98115 / US | 02 /
Ganugapati, Krishna 21617 NE 67th Street Redmond, Washington 98053 / US | 03 /
Simon, Daniel R. 16340 NE 83rd Street, Apt. E227 Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 04 /
Moore, Timothy M. 1223 167th Avenue SE Bellevue, Washington 98008 / US | 05 /
Bahl, Pradeep 21502 NE 84th Street Redmond, Washington 98053 / US | [2004/30] |
Former [2003/45] | 01 /
Ayyagari, Arun 4912 NE 88th Street Seatle, Washington 98115 / US | ||
02 /
Ganugapati, Krishna 21617 NE 67th Street Redmond, Washington 98053 / US | |||
03 /
Simon, Daniel R. 16340 NE 83rd Street, Apt. E227 Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | |||
04 /
Moore, Timothy M. 1223 167th Avenue SE Bellevue, Washington 98008 / US | |||
05 /
Bahl, Pradeep 21502 NE 84th Street Redmond, Washington 98053 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03008063.4 | 14.04.2003 | [2003/45] | Priority number, date | US20020135043 | 30.04.2002 Original published format: US 135043 | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1359491 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1359491 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | [2004/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1359491 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, H04L29/06, // H04L9/32 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
H04L63/0846 (EP,US);
G06F15/00 (KR);
G06F21/445 (EP,US);
G06F21/46 (EP,US);
H04L63/0869 (EP,US);
H04L63/162 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur ferngesteuerten Änderung eines Kommunikationspasswortes | [2003/45] | English: | Methods for remotely changing a communications password | [2003/45] | French: | Méthodes pour changer un mot de passe de communication à distance | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 17.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.11.2005 | CZ | 16.11.2005 | EE | 16.11.2005 | FI | 16.11.2005 | RO | 16.11.2005 | SI | 16.11.2005 | SK | 16.11.2005 | TR | 16.11.2005 | BG | 16.02.2006 | DK | 16.02.2006 | GR | 16.02.2006 | IE | 14.04.2006 | LU | 14.04.2006 | PT | 17.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | HU | 17.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 16.11.2005 | |
EE | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
RO | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
TR | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.04.2006 | ||
LU | 14.04.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 16.11.2005 | |
EE | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
RO | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.04.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
RO | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.04.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
RO | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.04.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.04.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CZ | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.04.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CZ | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.04.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | CZ | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | CZ | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/41] | CZ | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | CZ | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CZ | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 16.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5719941 (SWIFT MICHAEL M [US], et al) [A] 1-53 * abstract ** column 2, lines 22-36 *; | [X] - BERNARD ABOBA, DAN SIMON, TIM MOORE, MICROSOFT, "Secure Remote Password (SRP)", IEEE STANDARDS WORKING GROUPS, (200111), URL: http://grouper.ieee.org/groups/802/11/Documents/DocumentHolder/1-524.zip, (20030728), XP002249354 [X] 1-53 * the whole document * | [X] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 INTERNET SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM ON NETWORK AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS SECURITY, San Diego, CA, (199803), URL: ftp://srp.stanford.edu/pub/srp/srp.ps, (20030728), XP002249355 [X] 1-53 * abstract * * page 5, lines 10-13 * * page 6 - page 8 * | [XD] - WU T, "The SRP Authentication and Key Exchange System", ., (200009), URL: http://www.ietf.org/rfc/rfc2945.txt, (20030206), XP002230544 [XD] 1-53 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph L * | [X] - M. SWIFT ET AL., "Microsoft Windows 2000 Kerberos Change Password", NETWORK WORKING GROUP, (200202), URL: http://www.ietf.org/rfc/rfc3244.txt, (20030729), XP002249431 [X] 1-53 * the whole document * |