EP1359091 - Load dropping system with parachute [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christof, Horst Lindacher Weg 3 85653 Aying / DE | [2003/45] | Application number, filing date | 03008393.5 | 11.04.2003 | [2003/45] | Priority number, date | DE2002119952 | 03.05.2002 Original published format: DE 10219952 | DE2002141584 | 05.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10241584 | DE2003103788 | 31.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10303788 | [2007/32] |
Former [2003/45] | DE2002119952 | 03.05.2002 | |
DE2002141584 | 05.09.2002 | ||
DE2003103788 | 31.03.2003 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1359091 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1359091 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | [2005/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1359091 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B64D1/08, B64D1/14, B64D17/74 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
B64D1/08 (EP,US);
B64D17/22 (EP,US);
B64D17/64 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/45] | B64D1/08, B64D1/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/45] | Title | German: | Lastenabsetz-System mit einem Lastenschirm | [2003/45] | English: | Load dropping system with parachute | [2003/45] | French: | Système de largage de charges avec parachute | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 14.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.12.2007 | CZ | 26.12.2007 | DK | 26.12.2007 | EE | 26.12.2007 | FI | 26.12.2007 | IE | 26.12.2007 | NL | 26.12.2007 | RO | 26.12.2007 | SI | 26.12.2007 | SK | 26.12.2007 | TR | 26.12.2007 | BG | 26.03.2008 | SE | 26.03.2008 | GR | 27.03.2008 | ES | 06.04.2008 | AT | 11.04.2008 | LU | 11.04.2008 | BE | 30.04.2008 | CH | 30.04.2008 | LI | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | PT | 26.05.2008 | HU | 27.06.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 26.12.2007 | |
CZ | 26.12.2007 | ||
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
EE | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
BG | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
GR | 27.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
AT | 11.04.2008 | ||
LU | 11.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
HU | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 26.12.2007 | |
CZ | 26.12.2007 | ||
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
EE | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
BG | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
GR | 27.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
AT | 11.04.2008 | ||
LU | 11.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 26.12.2007 | |
CZ | 26.12.2007 | ||
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
EE | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
BG | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
GR | 27.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
AT | 11.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 26.12.2007 | |
CZ | 26.12.2007 | ||
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
EE | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
BG | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
GR | 27.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
EE | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
BG | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
GR | 27.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
EE | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
GR | 27.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
EE | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
GR | 27.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | FI | 26.12.2007 | |
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 26.12.2007 | |
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | FI | 26.12.2007 | |
SE | 26.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1047735 (MARCEL-GEORGES HENRY) [A] 1,9 * page 5, line 9 - line 15; figures 11,13 *; | [A]US3396924 (KRIESEL MARSHALL S) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [X]US3642235 (CRILEY RONALD L, et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 7 - line 14; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB1281903 (HAWKER SIDDELEY AVIATION LTD) [A] 1,9* the whole document *; | [X]US3724788 (PETRY G, et al) [X] 1,3-9 * column 5, line 37 - line 61; figure 3 * |