EP1466974 - Inducible site-directed mutagenesis through conditional gene rescue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAX-DELBRÜCK-CENTRUM FÜR MOLEKULARE MEDIZIN Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10 13125 Berlin / DE | [2004/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gotthardt, Michael Choriner Strasse 45 10435 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Radke, Michael Zillerstrasse 10 13187 Berlin / DE | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Krauss, Jan B., Dr. Forrester & Boehmert, Meinekestrasse 26 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 03008470.1 | 11.04.2003 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1466974 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, A01K67/00, A01K67/027 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
A01K67/0276 (EP,US);
C07K14/4716 (EP,US);
C12N15/102 (EP,US);
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
A01K2217/072 (EP,US);
A01K2217/075 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/03 (EP,US);
C12N2517/02 (EP,US);
C12N2800/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/42] | Title | German: | Induzierbare ortsspezifische Mutagenese durch bedingte Gen-rettung | [2004/42] | English: | Inducible site-directed mutagenesis through conditional gene rescue | [2004/42] | French: | Mutagenèse dirigé inductible grâce au sauvetage conditionel d'un gène | [2004/42] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/20] | 28.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/18] | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0160975 (ELITRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-17,19-27 * the whole document *; | [X]US6291245 (KOPETZKI ERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7-17,19-27 * the whole document *; | [XY] - BOCKAMP ERNESTO ET AL, "Of mice and models: Improved animal models for biomedical research.", PHYSIOLOGICAL GENOMICS, (20030120), vol. 11, ISSN 1094-8341, pages 115 - 132, XP009014519 [X] 1-5,7-17,19-27 * page 125 - page 128; figure 7 * [Y] 6,18 | [YD] - GOTTHARDT MICHAEL ET AL, "Conditional expression of mutant M-line titins results in cardiomyopathy with altered sarcomere structure.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20030221), vol. 278, no. 8, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 6059 - 6065, XP002249070 [YD] 6,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M211723200 | [X] - POOK M A ET AL, "Rescue of the Friedreich's ataxia knockout mouse by human YAC transgenesis.", NEUROGENETICS. ENGLAND OCT 2001, (200110), vol. 3, no. 4, ISSN 1364-6745, pages 185 - 193, XP002249071 [X] 1-5,7-17,19-27 * the whole document * | [X] - HAMILTON-WILLIAMS EMMA E ET AL, "Transgenic rescue implicates beta2-microglobulin as a diabetes susceptibility gene in nonobese diabetic (NOD) mice.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, September 25, 2001, (20010925), vol. 98, no. 20, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11533 - 11538, XP002249072 [X] 1-5,7-17,19-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.191383798 | [X] - MONANI UMRAO R ET AL, "A transgene carrying an A2G missense mutation in the SMN gene modulates phenotypic severity in mice with severe (type I) spinal muscular atrophy.", JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (20030106), vol. 160, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9525, pages 41 - 52, XP002249073 [X] 1-5,7-17,19-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.200208079 | [X] - WUTZ A ET AL, "Non-imprinted Igf2r expression decreases growth and rescues the Tme mutation in mice.", DEVELOPMENT (CAMBRIDGE), (200105), vol. 128, no. 10, ISSN 0950-1991, pages 1881 - 1887, XP002249074 [X] 1-5,7-17,19-27 * the whole document * | [X] - GANTOIS I ET AL, "Restoring the phenotype of fragile X syndrome: Insight from the mouse model.", CURRENT MOLECULAR MEDICINE (HILVERSUM), September, 2001, (200109), vol. 1, no. 4, ISSN 1566-5240, pages 447 - 455, XP009014502 [X] 1-5,7-17,19-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1566524013363492 | [AD] - KWAN KIN-MING, "Conditional alleles in mice: Practical considerations for tissue-specific knockouts.", GENESIS THE JOURNAL OF GENETICS AND DEVELOPMENT, February, 2002, (200202), vol. 32, no. 2, ISSN 1526-954X, pages 49 - 62, XP002249075 [AD] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/gene.10068 | [A] - TUVESON DAVID A ET AL, "Technologically advanced cancer modeling in mice.", CURRENT OPINION IN GENETICS & DEVELOPMENT, (200202), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 0959-437X, pages 105 - 110, XP002249076 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-437X(01)00272-6 |