EP1395076 - Method for selecting an access system and for transmitting data via a WLAN/mobile phone interworking system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Telecom Co., Ltd. 99, Seorin-Dong Jongro-ku Seoul 110-110 / KR | [2006/41] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states SK Telecom Co., Ltd. 99, Seorin-Dong Jongro-ku, Seoul 110-110 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Seong-Soo No. 203, 837-15, Hwagok-dong Gangseo-gu, Seoul / KR | 02 /
Lee, Dong-Hahk Jinheung Apt. N. 809-1101 Imaechon, 111, Imae-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Schneider, Henry Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | Schneider, Henry, Dipl.-Ing. Anwaltskanzlei Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2004/10] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03008492.5 | 11.04.2003 | [2004/10] | Priority number, date | KR20020051716 | 30.08.2002 Original published format: KR 2002051716 | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1395076 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1395076 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04L12/28 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04W36/0088 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Auswahl eines Zugangsnetzes und zur Datenübertragung über ein WLAN/ Mobilfunk Interworking System | [2004/10] | English: | Method for selecting an access system and for transmitting data via a WLAN/mobile phone interworking system | [2004/10] | French: | Procédé pour sélectionner un réseau d'accès et pour transmettre des données dans un système d'interconnection WLAN/cellulaire | [2006/21] |
Former [2004/10] | Méthode pour sélectionner un réseau d'accès et pour transmettre des données dans un système d'interconnection WLAN/cellulaire | Examination procedure | 26.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 23.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2006 | BE | 11.10.2006 | CH | 11.10.2006 | CY | 11.10.2006 | CZ | 11.10.2006 | EE | 11.10.2006 | FI | 11.10.2006 | LI | 11.10.2006 | NL | 11.10.2006 | RO | 11.10.2006 | SI | 11.10.2006 | SK | 11.10.2006 | TR | 11.10.2006 | BG | 11.01.2007 | DK | 11.01.2007 | SE | 11.01.2007 | GR | 12.01.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | IE | 11.04.2007 | LU | 11.04.2007 | HU | 12.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CY | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
IE | 11.04.2007 | ||
LU | 11.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
IE | 11.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
IE | 11.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
IE | 11.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 11.10.2006 | |
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 11.10.2006 | |
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | SI | 11.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5943333 (WHINNETT NICHOLAS WILLIAM [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * claim 1 * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 52 ** column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 12 *; | [X]US6243581 (JAWANDA JASTINDER [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figures 1,3,4 * * column 3, line 66 - column 6, line 10 *; | [A]US2001024953 (BALOGH PETER [FI]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,3,4 * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0045] *; | [X]US2002085516 (BRIDGELALL RAJ [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2,6,11-13 * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraphs [0065] , [0066] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0087] * | Examination | - M.CAPPIELLO, A.FLORIS, L. VELTRI, "Mobility amongst Heterogeneous Networks with AAA Support", IEEE 2002, (20020428), pages 2064 - 2069, XP010589849 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.2002.997211 |