EP1354710 - Inkjet printing apparatus and control method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Tadashi Canon K.K., 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hoshino, Takaaki Sakonyamadanchi 2-5-502, 1997, Sakonyama, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2003/49] |
Former [2003/43] | 01 /
Yamamoto, Shinji Canon K.K., 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Hoshino, Takaaki Sakonyamadanchi 2-5-502, 1997, Sakonyama, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/43] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03009034.4 | 17.04.2003 | [2003/43] | Priority number, date | JP20020116310 | 18.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002116310 | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1354710 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1354710 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | [2004/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1354710 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
B41J2/17566 (EP,US);
B41J2002/17579 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/10] |
Former [2003/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tintenstrahldruckgerät und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | [2003/43] | English: | Inkjet printing apparatus and control method therefor | [2003/43] | French: | Dispositif d'impression à jet d'encre et méthode de contrôle correspondante | [2003/43] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 09.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/39] | IT | 16.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JP2002019137 ; | [A]EP0666178 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,9,15,17 * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 7; figure 3 *; | [A]US6209980 (KOBAYASHI TAKAO [JP], et al) [A] 1,9,15,17 * column 6, line 11 - column 7, line 18; figures 1-3 * * column 8, line 33 - column 9, line 17; figure 8 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020503), vol. 2002, no. 05, & JP2002019137 A 20020123 (CANON INC) [DA] 1,9,15,17 * abstract * | by applicant | US4313124 | US4345262 | US4459600 | US4463359 | US4558333 | US4723129 | US4740796 | JP2001071585 | JP2002019137 |