EP1473123 - System for detecting, modifying and exploiting the movements of a robot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Battenberg, Günther Zum Stempel 11 35043 Marburg / DE | [2004/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/23] |
Former [2011/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/15] | Dropmann, Martin Clemens Hubert Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Buchhold, Jürgen, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Olbricht & Buchhold Am Weinberg 15 35096 Niederweimar / Lahn / DE | ||
Former [2004/45] | Olbricht, Karl Heinrich, Dipl.-Phys. Olbricht & Buchhold, Am Weinberg 15 35096 Weimar/Lahn / DE | Application number, filing date | 03009654.9 | 30.04.2003 | [2004/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1473123 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1473123 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16, B25J9/00 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
B25J9/1694 (EP);
B25J9/0096 (EP);
B25J9/1633 (EP);
B25J9/1684 (EP);
B25J9/1697 (EP);
G05B2219/37067 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/23] |
Former [2004/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 03.05.2005 | LT | 03.05.2005 | LV | 03.05.2005 | MK | 03.05.2005 | Title | German: | System zum Erfassen, Beeinflussen und Ausnutzen von Roboterbewegungen | [2004/45] | English: | System for detecting, modifying and exploiting the movements of a robot | [2004/45] | French: | Système pour détecter, modifier et exploiter les mouvements d'un robot | [2004/45] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.12.2017 | 30.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   07.07.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2003 | CY | 06.06.2018 | DK | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | ES | 06.06.2018 | FI | 06.06.2018 | IT | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | NL | 06.06.2018 | RO | 06.06.2018 | SE | 06.06.2018 | SI | 06.06.2018 | TR | 06.06.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | PT | 08.10.2018 | [2021/32] |
Former [2020/29] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/10] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/02] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4621332 (SUGIMOTO KOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - line 23 * * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 5 *; | [Y]US4836742 (ISHIGURO YASUO [JP], et al) [Y] 14 * abstract * * column 3, line 17 - line 29 *; | [X]EP0336342 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9 * abstract * * page 2, line 39 - page 3, line 9 * * page 4, line 34 - line 41 * * page 4, line 46 - line 49 * * page 5, line 15 - line 22 * * page 6, line 7 - line 12 *; | [X]US5125149 (INABA RYOHEI [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,10,15,17,18 * figures 1-3,7a-7c * * column 8, line 11 - line 20 * * column 18, line 3 - line 9 *; | [A]US5386762 (GOKEY PHILLIP E [US]) [A] 12 * figures 1,2,1a * * column 5, line 41 - line 44 * * column 6, line 3 - line 5 ** column 8, line 49 - line 55 *; | [XY]US5959425 (BIEMAN LEONARD H [US], et al) [X] 1,10,11,15 * abstract * * column 2, line 29 - line 46 * [Y] 14; | [X]EP1202041 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-11,15,16 * abstract * * column 4, paragraph 21 - paragraph 23 * * column 5, line 49 - line 56 * * column 6, line 10 - line 15 * * column 7, line 14 - line 34 * * column 7, line 42 - line 58 * | by applicant | DE3627560 | DE20003381U |