EP1359449 - An improved fiber optic cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetong-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-shi Kyungki-do Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS Co. Ltd. 416 Maetong-dong, Paldal-gu, Suwon-shi Kyungki-do, Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Ho-Soon, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 02 /
Hwang, Joong-Jin, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/45] | Lang, Johannes, Dipl.-Ing. Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Isenbruck, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03009734.9 | 02.05.2003 | [2003/45] | Priority number, date | KR20020024545 | 03.05.2002 Original published format: KR 2002024545 | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1359449 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1359449 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
G02B6/4413 (EP,US);
G02B6/44 (KR);
G02B6/4434 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/01] |
Former [2003/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbessertes faseroptisches Kabel | [2003/45] | English: | An improved fiber optic cable | [2003/45] | French: | Câble à fibres optiques amélioré | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 27.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/21] | 05.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3324597 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 8,9,14 * abstract ** page 3, line 31 - page 4, column 36 *; | [Y]US4781433 (ARROYO CANDIDO J [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,7-9,14 * abstract * * column 3, lines 59-68 * * column 9, lines 52-66 *; | [Y]US4828352 (KRAFT HEINRICH A [US]) [Y] 1-4,7,14 * abstract * * column 1, lines 24-34 * * column 3, lines 1-26 *; | [Y]EP0833177 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * * column 4, lines 25-42 *; | [Y]US6293081 (GRULICK MATTHEW J [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,9 * abstract * * column 3, lines 37-54 * |