EP1365232 - Solid-state pH sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tanita Corporation 14-2, Maeno-cho 1-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states TANITA CORPORATION 14-2, Maeno-cho 1-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states TANITA CORPORATION 14-2, Maino-cho 1-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yajima, Tatsuhiko, Tanita Cor. 14-2, Maeno-cho 1-chome, Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Uchiyama, Shunichi, Tanita Cor. 14-2, Maeno-cho 1-chome, Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Harima, Shinichi, Tanita Cor. 14-2, Maeno-cho 1-chome, Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03009773.7 | 08.05.2003 | [2003/48] | Priority number, date | JP20020145586 | 21.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002145586 | JP20030050297 | 27.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003050297 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1365232 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1365232 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/333, G01N27/403 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
G01N27/302 (EP);
G01N27/3335 (US);
G01N27/401 (US);
G01N27/4035 (US);
G01N27/301 (EP);
G01N27/4167 (EP);
G01N27/4168 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/34] |
Former [2003/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Festkörper pH-Sensor | [2003/48] | English: | Solid-state pH sensor | [2003/48] | French: | Capteur de pH à l'état solide | [2003/48] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 03.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07128282 ; | [Y]US4559112 (TAMAMURA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 4,6,7 * column 3, line 24 - line 34 * * column 5, line 29 - line 30 * * column 6, line 5 - line 7 *; | [A]US4582589 (USHIZAWA NORIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * column W *; | [XY]EP0433261 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [X] 1-3,8-10 * page 5, line 28 - line 31 * * page 6, line 4 - line 51 * * page 7, line 4 - line 45 * * page 8, line 19 - line 23 * * page 8, line 40 - line 51; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4,6,7,12; | [Y]US5354449 (BAND DAVID M [GB], et al) [Y] 12 * column 6, line 33 - line 42 *; | [X] - KINLEN P J ET AL, "A solid-state pH sensor based on a Nafion-coated iridium oxide indicator electrode and a polymer-based silver chloride reference electrode", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (19941001), vol. 22, no. 1, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 13 - 25, XP004012395 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0925-4005(94)01254-7 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, & JP07128282 A 19950519 (RENGO CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |