EP1358812 - Foot support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dosenbach-Ochsner AG Schuhe und Sport Allmendstrasse 25 8953 Dietikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Dosenbach-Ochsner AG Allmendstrasse 25 8953 Dietikon / CH | ||
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states EA GmbH i.L. Hoffmannallee 41-51 47533 Kleve / DE | ||
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Elefanten GmbH Hoffmannallee 41-51 47533 Kleve / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Axt, Matthias, Dr. 241 Grafton Rd Armidale NSW 2350 / AU | 02 /
Döderlein, Leonhard, Dr. Bismarckstrasse 60 69198 Schriesheim / DE | 03 /
Jacobs, Josef Tannenforst 2 47551 Bedburg-Hau / DE | 04 /
Lauer, Peter von Brentano-Strasse 4 47533 Kleve / DE | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | Sparing - Röhl - Henseler Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03009987.3 | 02.05.2003 | [2003/45] | Priority number, date | DE2002120004 | 03.05.2002 Original published format: DE 10220004 | [2003/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1358812 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1358812 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A43B7/22, A43B7/24 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
A43B7/141 (EP,US);
A43B17/00 (EP,US);
A43B7/143 (EP,US);
A43B7/1435 (EP,US);
A43B7/223 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/45] | Title | German: | Fussbett | [2003/45] | English: | Foot support | [2003/45] | French: | Renfort de pied | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 23.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.03.2005 | EE | 30.03.2005 | IE | 30.03.2005 | RO | 30.03.2005 | SI | 30.03.2005 | SK | 30.03.2005 | TR | 30.03.2005 | CY | 02.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | BG | 30.06.2005 | GR | 30.06.2005 | SE | 30.06.2005 | HU | 01.07.2005 | ES | 11.07.2005 | PT | 08.09.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/42] | CZ | 30.03.2005 | |
EE | 30.03.2005 | ||
IE | 30.03.2005 | ||
RO | 30.03.2005 | ||
SI | 30.03.2005 | ||
SK | 30.03.2005 | ||
TR | 30.03.2005 | ||
CY | 02.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
BG | 30.06.2005 | ||
GR | 30.06.2005 | ||
HU | 01.07.2005 | ||
ES | 11.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 30.03.2005 | |
EE | 30.03.2005 | ||
IE | 30.03.2005 | ||
SI | 30.03.2005 | ||
SK | 30.03.2005 | ||
TR | 30.03.2005 | ||
CY | 02.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
BG | 30.06.2005 | ||
GR | 30.06.2005 | ||
HU | 01.07.2005 | ||
ES | 11.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | CZ | 30.03.2005 | |
EE | 30.03.2005 | ||
IE | 30.03.2005 | ||
SI | 30.03.2005 | ||
SK | 30.03.2005 | ||
TR | 30.03.2005 | ||
CY | 02.05.2005 | ||
BG | 30.06.2005 | ||
GR | 30.06.2005 | ||
HU | 01.07.2005 | ||
ES | 11.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CZ | 30.03.2005 | |
EE | 30.03.2005 | ||
IE | 30.03.2005 | ||
SI | 30.03.2005 | ||
SK | 30.03.2005 | ||
TR | 30.03.2005 | ||
BG | 30.06.2005 | ||
GR | 30.06.2005 | ||
HU | 01.07.2005 | ||
ES | 11.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CZ | 30.03.2005 | |
EE | 30.03.2005 | ||
IE | 30.03.2005 | ||
SI | 30.03.2005 | ||
SK | 30.03.2005 | ||
TR | 30.03.2005 | ||
BG | 30.06.2005 | ||
GR | 30.06.2005 | ||
ES | 11.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | CZ | 30.03.2005 | |
IE | 30.03.2005 | ||
SI | 30.03.2005 | ||
SK | 30.03.2005 | ||
TR | 30.03.2005 | ||
BG | 30.06.2005 | ||
GR | 30.06.2005 | ||
ES | 11.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | CZ | 30.03.2005 | |
IE | 30.03.2005 | ||
SI | 30.03.2005 | ||
SK | 30.03.2005 | ||
BG | 30.06.2005 | ||
GR | 30.06.2005 | ||
ES | 11.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | CZ | 30.03.2005 | |
SI | 30.03.2005 | ||
SK | 30.03.2005 | ||
BG | 30.06.2005 | ||
GR | 30.06.2005 | ||
ES | 11.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | SI | 30.03.2005 | |
SK | 30.03.2005 | ||
BG | 30.06.2005 | ||
GR | 30.06.2005 | ||
ES | 11.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | SI | 30.03.2005 | |
SK | 30.03.2005 | ||
BG | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/01] | SI | 30.03.2005 | |
SK | 30.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SI | 30.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2081474 (BURNS WILLIAM C) [X] 1,3-9,12,13,15,16,18-20 * the whole document *; | [X]DE912546 (WILHELM BOHL) [X] 1-3,5,6,15-18,20,21 * the whole document *; | [X]US2790254 (BURNS WILLIAM C) [X] 1,3-9,12,13,15,16,18-20* the whole document * |