EP1362875 - Bifunctional polyaddition compounds as crosslinkers for polyurethane powder coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | 19.10.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wenning, Andreas, Dr. Alter Sportplatz 13 a 48301 Nottuln / DE | [2003/47] | Application number, filing date | 03010087.9 | 03.05.2003 | [2003/47] | Priority number, date | DE2002127183 | 11.05.2002 Original published format: DE 10227183 | [2003/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1362875 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/79, C08G18/80 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
C08G18/8048 (EP,US);
C08G18/798 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/47] | Title | German: | Bifunktionelle Polyadditionsverbindungen als Vernetzer für Polyurethan-Pulverlacke | [2003/47] | English: | Bifunctional polyaddition compounds as crosslinkers for polyurethane powder coatings | [2003/47] | French: | Composés de polyaddition bifonctionnels comme durcisseurs de peintures pulvérulentes de polyuréthane | [2003/47] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 29.09.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4801623 (HESS HEINRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1* column 2, line 13 - column 6, line 31; example 3; claims 1-6 *; | [A]EP0443138 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-7,15,16 * page 2, line 34 - page 4, line 27; examples 1,2,6; claims 1-3 *; | [X]EP0566953 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,7,10 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 57; example 3; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0874010 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 45 - page 5, line 2; claims 1-6 * |