EP1362538 - Sink [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BLANCO GmbH + Co KG Flehinger Strasse 59 75038 Oberderdingen / DE | [2003/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wassiliadis, Thomas Gerhart-Hauptmann-Strasse 35 75038 Oberderdingen / DE | 02 /
Ziemann, Brigitte Traufweg 3 75031 Eppingen / DE | [2003/47] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03010157.0 | 06.05.2003 | [2003/47] | Priority number, date | DE2002122046 | 13.05.2002 Original published format: DE 10222046 | [2003/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1362538 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1362538 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A47J47/20, A47L17/02, A47L19/02, E03C1/18 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
E03C1/18 (EP,US);
A47J47/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/37] |
Former [2003/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Spüle | [2003/47] | English: | Sink | [2003/47] | French: | Evier | [2003/47] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 10.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.09.2008 | CZ | 10.09.2008 | DK | 10.09.2008 | EE | 10.09.2008 | FI | 10.09.2008 | IE | 10.09.2008 | IT | 10.09.2008 | NL | 10.09.2008 | RO | 10.09.2008 | SI | 10.09.2008 | SK | 10.09.2008 | TR | 10.09.2008 | BG | 10.12.2008 | SE | 10.12.2008 | GR | 11.12.2008 | ES | 21.12.2008 | PT | 10.02.2009 | HU | 11.03.2009 | AT | 06.05.2009 | LU | 06.05.2009 | BE | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
HU | 11.03.2009 | ||
AT | 06.05.2009 | ||
LU | 06.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
AT | 06.05.2009 | ||
LU | 06.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
AT | 06.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/37] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
AT | 06.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | FI | 10.09.2008 | |
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | FI | 10.09.2008 | |
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 10.09.2008 | |
SI | 10.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3837634 (COBB W) [Y] 9-13,17,18 * abstract *; | [XY]US3918377 (HERBOLD WERNER R) [X] 1,2,7 * abstract * [Y] 9-13,17,18; | [A]DE20112173U (BLANCO GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE20117624U (BLANCO GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-23* the whole document * | by applicant | DE19738964 | DE20117624U |