EP1371769 - Buttonhole sewing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DÜRKOPP ADLER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Potsdamer Strasse 190 D-33719 Bielefeld / DE | [2003/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Filges, Karsten Im Tempelkamp 26 33699 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
Janocha, Theodor Im Twistel 15 33739 Bielefeld / DE | 03 /
Fischer, Jochen Höpperkuhle 1 32758 Detmold / DE | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Rau, Manfred, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03010636.3 | 13.05.2003 | [2003/51] | Priority number, date | DE2002125511 | 10.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10225511 | [2003/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1371769 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1371769 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1371769 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | D05B3/06, D05B37/04 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
D05B3/06 (EP,US);
D05B37/04 (EP,US);
D05D2203/00 (EP,US);
D05D2207/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/51] | D05B3/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/51] | Title | German: | Knopfloch-Nähmaschine | [2003/51] | English: | Buttonhole sewing machine | [2003/51] | French: | Machine à coudre les boutonnières | [2003/51] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 13.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.03.2007 | DK | 28.03.2007 | EE | 28.03.2007 | FI | 28.03.2007 | GB | 28.03.2007 | IE | 28.03.2007 | NL | 28.03.2007 | SI | 28.03.2007 | SK | 28.03.2007 | AT | 13.05.2007 | LU | 13.05.2007 | BE | 31.05.2007 | CH | 31.05.2007 | LI | 31.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | SE | 28.06.2007 | GR | 29.06.2007 | ES | 09.07.2007 | PT | 28.08.2007 | HU | 29.09.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 28.03.2007 | |
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
GB | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
AT | 13.05.2007 | ||
LU | 13.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 28.03.2007 | |
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
GB | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
AT | 13.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | DK | 28.03.2007 | |
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
GB | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
AT | 13.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/39] | DK | 28.03.2007 | |
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
GB | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
AT | 13.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | DK | 28.03.2007 | |
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
GB | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | DK | 28.03.2007 | |
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | DK | 28.03.2007 | |
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 28.03.2007 | |
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 28.03.2007 | |
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | FI | 28.03.2007 | |
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 28.03.2007 | |
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | FI | 28.03.2007 | |
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 28.03.2007 | |
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE291197 (THE SINGER MANUFACTURING COMPANY) [A] 1-3,5,7 * page 1, line 1 - line 28 * * page 2, line 67 - line 114 *; | [A]JPH07328261 ; | [A]DE3930562 (DÜRKOPP ADDLER AG); | [A]DE19716629 (DUERKOPP ADLER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [DA]DE19916660 (DUERKOPP ADLER AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 4, line 6 - line 67 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07328261 A 19951219 (BROTHER IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |