EP1362757 - Electrically-operated parking brake device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwagawa, Yoshihiro K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Miyakawa, Jun K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Taniguchi, Makoto K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 04 /
Kichima, Yutaka K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 05 /
Takei, Katsuyuki K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 06 /
Bessho, Makoto K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [2003/47] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03010702.3 | 13.05.2003 | [2003/47] | Priority number, date | JP20020136779 | 13.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002136779 | [2003/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1362757 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1362757 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1362757 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/74, B60T7/04, B60T7/10, B60T11/04 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
B60T13/746 (EP,US);
B60T11/046 (EP,US);
B60T7/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2005/19] |
Former [2003/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrischer Feststellbremsaktuator | [2003/47] | English: | Electrically-operated parking brake device | [2003/47] | French: | Actionneur électrique d'un frein de stationnement | [2003/47] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 14.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP7144623 ; | [DA]JPH07144623 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [DA] 1 * figure 14 *; | [A]FR2813837 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1* abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP7144623 A 19950606 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |