EP1334696 - Organ anastomosing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yugengaisha Pacs Optica Japan 3-11-17-203, Hikonari Misato-Shi Saitama-Ken / JP | [2007/11] |
Former [2003/33] | For all designated states Yugengaisha Pacs Optica Japan 3-11-17-203, Hikonari Misato-Shi, Saitama-Ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamanouchi, Eigoro 3-11-17-203, Hikonari Misato-Shi, Saitama-Ken / JP | [2003/33] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Kramer - Barske - Schmiedtchen European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/33] | Barske, Heiko, Dr. rer. nat., et al Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR, Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03010851.8 | 18.08.2000 | [2003/33] | Priority number, date | JP19990232876 | 19.08.1999 Original published format: JP 23287699 | JP20000072550 | 15.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000072550 | [2003/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1334696 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1334696 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1334696 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/11 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
A61B17/11 (EP,US);
A61B17/1114 (EP,US);
A61B17/32053 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0003 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00876 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1117 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/33] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Anastomose von Organen | [2003/33] | English: | Organ anastomosing apparatus | [2003/33] | French: | Dispositif d'anastomose des organes | [2003/33] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 31.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00117824.3 / EP1077047 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8100668 (JANSEN A [NL]); | [A]SU1635966 (SVERDLOVSK G MED INST [SU]) [A] 10 * pages 1-5 *; | [A]US5595562 (GRIER JONATHAN F [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 1 - column 2 *; | [AD]EP0754434 (COOK INC [US]) [AD] 1,5,6,10 * column 7; claim 5 *; | [X]FR2760627 (POZZI JEAN PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1,4-6,11 * page 3 - page 6; figure 2 * | [ ] - SVERD, DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1992-055165 [ ] * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0910218 |