EP1387377 - Modular disconnector with snap closing mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEWISS S.p.A. Via Alessandro Volta, 1 24069 Cenate Sotto (Bergamo) / IT | [2007/33] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states Gewiss S.P.A. Via Alessandro Volta, 1 24069 Cenate Sotto (Bergamo) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bosatelli, Domenico Via Degli Alpini, 13 24069 Cenate Sotto (Bergamo) / IT | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Forattini, Amelia, et al Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Forattini, Amelia, et al c/o Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03010946.6 | 16.05.2003 | [2004/06] | Priority number, date | IT2002MI01060 | 17.05.2002 Original published format: IT MI20021060 | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1387377 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1387377 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1387377 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01H23/20 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
H01H23/20 (EP);
H01H23/164 (EP);
H01H2300/048 (EP);
H01H71/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/47] |
Former [2004/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Modularer Unterbrecher mit Schnelleinschaltvorrichtung | [2004/06] | English: | Modular disconnector with snap closing mechanism | [2004/06] | French: | Déconnecteur modulaire avec mécanisme de fermeture brusque | [2004/06] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 26.08.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.05.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.10.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 16.11.2007 | ES | 26.11.2007 | FR | 11.04.2008 | [2012/40] |
Former [2008/36] | DE | 16.11.2007 | |
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 26.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1175350 (SURSUM ELEK ZITAETS GES LEYHAU) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [Y]DE8905764U (LINDNER GMBH) [Y] 1-6 * column W *; | [Y]US5300906 (BLANCHARD CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [Y] 1-6 * figure 4 * |