EP1366654 - Round baler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | ||
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viaud, Jean 6, rue Docteur Prieur 70100 Gray / FR | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard Deere & Company European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03011394.8 | 20.05.2003 | [2003/49] | Priority number, date | DE2002124394 | 01.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10224394 | [2003/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1366654 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1366654 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/08 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
A01F15/0883 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/49] | Title | German: | Rundballenpresse | [2003/49] | English: | Round baler | [2003/49] | French: | Presse à balles cylindriques | [2003/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 16.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.11.2007 | CZ | 14.11.2007 | DK | 14.11.2007 | EE | 14.11.2007 | FI | 14.11.2007 | GB | 14.11.2007 | RO | 14.11.2007 | SI | 14.11.2007 | SK | 14.11.2007 | TR | 14.11.2007 | BG | 14.02.2008 | SE | 14.02.2008 | GR | 15.02.2008 | ES | 25.02.2008 | PT | 14.04.2008 | AT | 20.05.2008 | IE | 20.05.2008 | IT | 20.05.2008 | LU | 20.05.2008 | HU | 21.05.2008 | BE | 31.05.2008 | CH | 31.05.2008 | LI | 31.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | FR | 02.06.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
AT | 20.05.2008 | ||
IE | 20.05.2008 | ||
IT | 20.05.2008 | ||
LU | 20.05.2008 | ||
HU | 21.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2008 | ||
LI | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
FR | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
AT | 20.05.2008 | ||
IE | 20.05.2008 | ||
IT | 20.05.2008 | ||
HU | 21.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2008 | ||
LI | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
FR | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
IE | 20.05.2008 | ||
HU | 21.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2008 | ||
LI | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
FR | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
IE | 20.05.2008 | ||
HU | 21.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2008 | ||
LI | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
FR | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
HU | 21.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2008 | ||
LI | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
HU | 21.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2008 | ||
LI | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
HU | 21.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2008 | ||
LI | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/03] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 14.11.2007 | |
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | FI | 14.11.2007 | |
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3974632 (VAN DER LELY CORNELIS) [X] 1,2,8-10 * column 4, line 1 - line 45 * * column 10, line 37 - line 65; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0258528 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1,2,9 * column 4, line 9 - line 41; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4315374 (DEERE & CO [DE]) [A] 1,2,9* column 4, line 29 - line 33; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1151657 (LELY WELGER MASCHINENFABRIK GM [DE]) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 20 - line 25; figure - *; | [PX]US2002121200 (VIAUD JEAN [FR]) [PX] 1,2,4,9 * page 3, paragraph 29; figure 4 * |