EP1365481 - Card-edge connector and card member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamiyamane, Shin NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/48] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03011442.5 | 20.05.2003 | [2003/48] | Priority number, date | JP20020144014 | 20.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002144014 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1365481 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1365481 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1365481 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/18, H05K1/11 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
H01R12/721 (EP,US);
H01R13/631 (EP,US);
H05K1/117 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10598 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/48] | H01R12/18 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [2004/43] |
Former [2003/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Leiterplattenrandverbinder und Karte | [2003/48] | English: | Card-edge connector and card member | [2003/48] | French: | Connecteur de bord de carte et carte | [2003/48] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 30.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 13.12.2006 | CH | 31.05.2007 | LI | 31.05.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | CH | 31.05.2007 | |
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
FR | 03.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CH | 31.05.2007 | |
LI | 31.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH07231153 ; | [X]US4687266 (TANII JUNICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,7 * column 2, line 41 - line 46 *; | [X]US5236372 (YUNOKI SHUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,7 * figures 1-8 *; | [X]US6012928 (LOPATA JOHN E [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * column 9, line 15 - line 19 *; | [X]US2001014546 (YASUFUKU KAORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 1, paragraph 6 * * page 3, paragraph 47 *; | [X]WO0159887 (TYCO ELECTRONICS BELGIUM EC NV [BE], et al) [X] 1,3,7 * page 9, line 32 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07231153 A 19950829 (IBIDEN CO LTD) [DA] 1-8 * abstract * |