EP1482187 - Device for connecting bar ends [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALFEN GmbH & CO. Kommanditgesellschaft Liebigstrasse 14 40764 Langenfeld-Richrath / DE | [2004/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fröhlich, Klaus Weinsteige 22 75177 Pforzheim / DE | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Riedel, Peter, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwalts-Kanzlei Dipl.-Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner Menzelstrasse 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Riedel, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt, Dipl.-Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner, Menzelstrasse 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03011801.2 | 26.05.2003 | [2004/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1482187 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1482187 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/04, E04C5/16 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
E04C5/165 (EP,US);
F16B7/182 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verbinden von Stabenden | [2004/49] | English: | Device for connecting bar ends | [2004/49] | French: | Dispositif pour relier des extrémités de barre | [2004/49] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 06.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.10.2005 | CZ | 19.10.2005 | EE | 19.10.2005 | FI | 19.10.2005 | IE | 19.10.2005 | RO | 19.10.2005 | SI | 19.10.2005 | SK | 19.10.2005 | TR | 19.10.2005 | BG | 19.01.2006 | DK | 19.01.2006 | GR | 19.01.2006 | PT | 20.03.2006 | HU | 20.04.2006 | LU | 26.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 19.10.2005 | |
EE | 19.10.2005 | ||
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 19.10.2005 | ||
RO | 19.10.2005 | ||
SI | 19.10.2005 | ||
SK | 19.10.2005 | ||
TR | 19.10.2005 | ||
BG | 19.01.2006 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
HU | 20.04.2006 | ||
LU | 26.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 19.10.2005 | |
EE | 19.10.2005 | ||
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 19.10.2005 | ||
RO | 19.10.2005 | ||
SI | 19.10.2005 | ||
SK | 19.10.2005 | ||
BG | 19.01.2006 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
HU | 20.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 19.10.2005 | |
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 19.10.2005 | ||
RO | 19.10.2005 | ||
SI | 19.10.2005 | ||
SK | 19.10.2005 | ||
BG | 19.01.2006 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
HU | 20.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CZ | 19.10.2005 | |
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 19.10.2005 | ||
SI | 19.10.2005 | ||
SK | 19.10.2005 | ||
BG | 19.01.2006 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
HU | 20.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | CZ | 19.10.2005 | |
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 19.10.2005 | ||
SI | 19.10.2005 | ||
SK | 19.10.2005 | ||
BG | 19.01.2006 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | CZ | 19.10.2005 | |
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 19.10.2005 | ||
SI | 19.10.2005 | ||
SK | 19.10.2005 | ||
BG | 19.01.2006 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | CZ | 19.10.2005 | |
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 19.10.2005 | ||
SK | 19.10.2005 | ||
BG | 19.01.2006 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | CZ | 19.10.2005 | |
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
SK | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CZ | 19.10.2005 | |
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
SK | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 19.10.2005 | |
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 19.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0348060 (METAL BOND TECH LTD [GB]) [DY] 10,11* the whole document *; | [XY]DE29500727U (PFEIFER SEIL HEBETECH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9 * the whole document * [Y] 10,11 |