EP1367375 - Device for balancing a vehicle wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states att Automotive Testing Technologies GmbH Robert-Koch-Strasse 35 77694 Kehl-Auenheim / DE | [2003/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becker, Manfred Seltalstrasse 3 78573 Wurmlingen / DE | 02 /
Gnielka, Peter Dr. Alexandraweg 39 64287 Darmstadt / DE | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | Kaiser, Magnus, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | Kaiser, Magnus, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 11 08 47 76058 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 03012018.2 | 28.05.2003 | [2003/49] | Priority number, date | DE2002123841 | 28.05.2002 Original published format: DE 10223841 | [2003/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1367375 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01M1/22, G01M1/02 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
G01M1/225 (EP);
G01M1/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Auswuchten eines Fahrzeugrades | [2003/49] | English: | Device for balancing a vehicle wheel | [2003/49] | French: | Dispositif d'équilibrage d'une roue de véhicule | [2003/49] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 31.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.06.2006 | 29.05.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/43] | 17.06.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/43] | 30.06.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4507964 (BORNER WILLY [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 18 * * column 3, line 33 - line 68 * * column 4, line 23 - column 6, line 57 *; | [Y]US4750361 (BANDHOPADHYAY DEB K [US]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 39 *; | [A]EP0355486 (ROHE GMBH A [DE]) [A] 1-4 * abstract ** column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 58 *; | [Y]DE4028656 (SCHENCK AG CARL [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - line 22 * * column 1, line 64 - column 5, line 30 *; | [Y]US6336364 (PARKER PAUL DANIEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * column 12, line 31 - line 50 * |