EP1369048 - Shoe with permeable and breathable upper that covers at least partially an impermeable sole that is rendered breathable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state ???moredetails.lapse.edited??? CY | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geox S.p.A. Via Feltrina Centro, 16 31044 Montebelluna Località Biadene (Treviso) / IT | [2003/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Polegato Moretti, Mario Via Antonini, 7 31035 Crocetta del Montello / IT | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2003/50] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati, Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03012182.6 | 04.06.2003 | [2003/50] | Priority number, date | IT2002PD00153 | 06.06.2002 Original published format: IT PD20020153 | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1369048 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1369048 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A43B3/14, A43B7/12, A43B13/26 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
A43B9/00 (EP,US);
A43B7/06 (EP,US);
A43B7/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/50] | Extension states | AL | 27.05.2004 | LT | 27.05.2004 | LV | 27.05.2004 | MK | 27.05.2004 | Title | German: | Schuh mit wasserdurchlässigem und atmungsaktivem Oberschuh, der zumindest teilweise eine atmungsaktiv-gewordene wasserundurchlässige Sohle bedeckt | [2003/50] | English: | Shoe with permeable and breathable upper that covers at least partially an impermeable sole that is rendered breathable | [2003/50] | French: | Chaussure avec une tige perméable et respirante qui recouvre au moins partiellement une semelle imperméable rendue respirante | [2003/50] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 28.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.10.2006 | [2009/38] |
Former [2008/04] | deleted | ||
Former [2007/39] | IT | 04.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US429429 (ECKHARDT LOUIS [DE]) [Y] 1,3,7,9,10,14,15 * page 1, line 35 - line 48; figure 5 *; | [A]US5515566 (GANON MICHAEL H [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0619959 (NOTTINGTON HOLDING BV [NL]) [A] 1-4,10 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 16; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US2001010127 (POLEGATO MORETTI MARIO [IT]) [Y] 1,3,7,9,10,14,15 * the whole document * |