EP1372119 - IC card and cryptographic communication method between IC cards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sakamura, Ken 4-9-2 Osaki, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | For all designated states Koshizuka, Noboru 2-27-20, Nishikubo Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-0013 / JP | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states Sakamura, Ken 4-9-2 Osaki, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | ||
For all designated states Koshizuka, Noboru 2-27-20, Nishikubo Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-0013 / JP | |||
For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states Sakamura, Ken 9-2, Osaki 4-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Koshizuka, Noboru 2-27-20, Nishikubo Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-0013 / JP | |||
For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states Sakamura, Ken 4-9-2 Osaki, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | ||
For all designated states Koshizuka, Noboru 2-27-20, Nishikubo Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-0013 / JP | |||
For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakamura, Ken 4-9-2 Osaki Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | 02 /
Koshizuka, Noboru 27-20, Nishikubo 2-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Aono, Hiroshi, c/o Int. Prop. Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Ishii, Kazuhiko, c/o Int. Prop. Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Mori, Kensaku, c/o Int. Prop. Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Hongo, Sadayuki, c/o Int. Prop. Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2007/39] |
Former [2007/37] | 01 /
Sakamura, Ken 9-2, Osaki 4-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Koshizuka, Noboru 27-20, Nishikubo 2-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Aono, Hiroshi, c/o Int. Prop. Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Ishii, Kazuhiko, c/o Int. Prop. Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
05 /
Mori, Kensaku, c/o Int. Prop. Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
06 /
Hongo, Sadayuki, c/o Int. Prop. Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2003/51] | 01 /
Sakamura, Ken 9-2, Osaki 4-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Koshizuka, Noboru 27-20, Nishikubo 2-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Aono, Hiroshi, Int. Prop. Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Ishii, Kazuhiko, Int. Prop. Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
05 /
Mori, Kensaku, Int. Prop. Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
06 /
Hongo, Sadayuki, Int. Prop. Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03012242.8 | 10.06.2003 | [2003/51] | Priority number, date | JP20020169193 | 10.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002169193 | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1372119 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1372119 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10, G07F7/08 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06F21/00 (KR);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40975 (EP,US);
H04L9/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/37] |
Former [2003/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Chipkarte und Methode zur kryptographischen Kommunikation zwischen Chipkarten | [2003/51] | English: | IC card and cryptographic communication method between IC cards | [2003/51] | French: | Carte à puce et méthode de communication cryptée entre carte à puce | [2003/51] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 24.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 12.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0668579 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, lines 12-52 * * page 4, lines 3-32 * * page 5, lines 9-16 * * page 8, line 34 - page 10, line 40 * * figures 1,4A,4B *; | [XY]EP0932128 (NTT DATA CORP [JP], et al) [X] 2 * figures 1-4,7,12; claims 7,19 * * column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 8 * * column 16, paragraph 48 - paragraph 50 * * column 34, paragraph 114 - column 36, paragraph 130 * * column 38, paragraph 149 - column 39 * [Y] 1,3; | [A]US6192349 (HUSEMANN DIRK [CH], et al) [A] 2 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 67 * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [Y]WO0167325 (PIA CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3 * abstract *; | [PX]WO02082386 (FREEDOM CARD LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-3 * figures 1,4,7,17; claims 1,10,17 * * page 6, line 6 - line 15 * * page 9, line 2 - line 26 * * page 13, line 8 - page 14, line 5 * * page 16, line 1 - page 17, line 9 * * page 22, line 9 - page 25, line 5 * * page 40, line 19 - line 28 * * page 49, line 26 - page 50, line 15 *; | [A] - "ISO/IEC 7816-4 : Interindustry command for interchange", ISO/IEC STANDARD, (19950901), URL: www.ttfn.net/techno/smartcards/iso7816_html, (20031016), XP002258173 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * | [A] - LEACH J, "Dynamic Authentication for Smartcards", COMPUTERS & SECURITY. INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL DEVOTED TO THE STUDY OF TECHNICAL AND FINANCIAL ASPECTS OF COMPUTER SECURITY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS. AMSTERDAM, NL, (1995), vol. 14, no. 5, ISSN 0167-4048, pages 385 - 389, XP004002047 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-4048(95)97089-S |