EP1391694 - Method for determining map data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/42] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otte, Dirk Am Heesekamp 4 30880 Laatzen / DE | [2004/09] | Application number, filing date | 03012297.2 | 12.06.2003 | [2004/09] | Priority number, date | DE2002138530 | 22.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10238530 | [2004/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1391694 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1391694 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | [2007/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1391694 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/32 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
G09B29/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/28] |
Former [2004/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ermitteln von Kartendaten | [2004/09] | English: | Method for determining map data | [2004/09] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer des données cartographiques | [2004/09] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 03.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 05.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3744533 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 40 - line 49; figures 1,17 * * figure 18 *; | [X] - JIE SHAN, D. SCOTT LEE, ISPRS COMMISSION IV SYMPOSIUM GEOSPATIAL THEORY, PROCESSING AND APPLICATIONS, Ottawa, vol. XXXIV, ISSN 1682-1750, (20020708), URL: http://www.isprs.org/commission4/proceedings02/pdfpapers/492.pdf, (20070830), XP002449128 [X] 1-5,7 * column 2, line 8 - line 24 * * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 23; figure 4 * * column 7, line 11 - column 8, line 6 * | [X] - DOUGLAS D H ET AL, "ALGORITHMS FOR THE REDUCTION OF THE NUMBER OF POINTS REQUIRED TO REPRESENT A DIGITIZED LINE OR ITS CARICATURE", CANADIAN CARTOGRAPHER, YORK UNIVERSITY, DOWNSVIEW, CA, (1973), vol. 10, no. 2, ISSN 0008-3127, pages 112 - 122, XP009005710 [X] 1-5,7 * column 1, line 1 - line 6 * * column 11, line 36 - column 12, line 40; figure 6 * * column 20, line 11 - line 15 * |