EP1369076 - Drying apparatus for footwear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Change - priority | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marolt, Oswald Untervocken 15 9821 Obervellach / AT | [2003/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Hehenberger, Reinhard, et al BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | Hehenberger, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing., Patentanwalt, et al Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 03012586.8 | 03.06.2003 | [2003/50] | Priority number, date | AT20020000351U | 03.06.2002 Original published format: AT 35102 U | [2013/10] |
Former [2003/50] | AT20020035120U | 03.06.2002 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1369076 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A47L23/20 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
A47L23/205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/50] | Title | German: | Schuhtrockner | [2003/50] | English: | Drying apparatus for footwear | [2003/50] | French: | Appareil pour le sechage de chaussures | [2003/50] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 05.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 08.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08103408 ; | [A]US4198765 (MIYAMAE TOSHIAKI [JP]) [A] 1,10 * column W *; | [AD]US4727656 (JANNACH HELMUT [AT], et al) [AD] 1 * column W *; | [Y]EP0291257 (KAFFKA MICHAEL GABOR) [Y] 2,4 * column 3, line 36 - column 8, line 51; figures 1,2,6; examples 1,6,8 *; | [XDAY]AT401720B (JANNACH HELMUT [AT]) [XD] 1,3,8 * the whole document * [A] 9 [Y] 2,4 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, & JP08103408 A 19960423 (ADTEC:KK) [A] 1,9 * abstract * |