EP1371876 - Belt for continuously variable transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2005/50] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanehara, Shigeru c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Arikawa, Mamoru c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Yagasaki, Toru c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03012710.4 | 04.06.2003 | [2003/51] | Priority number, date | JP20020170341 | 11.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002170341 | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1371876 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1371876 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1371876 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16G5/16 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
F16G5/16 (EP,US);
F16G5/163 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2005/38] |
Former [2003/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Riemen für ein stufenlos regelbares Getriebe | [2003/51] | English: | Belt for continuously variable transmission | [2003/51] | French: | Courroie pour transmission continûment variable | [2003/51] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 12.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9959751 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 7, line 12 - line 19; figure 6 *; | [A]EP0909907 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 58 - page 4, line 3; figure 3 *; | [A]JPS6179041 ; | [AD]JP5056415B ; | [A]EP1184591 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 3; figure 4 *; | [A]US4332575 (HENDRIKS EMERY F M); | [AD]JPH0222254B | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860827), vol. 0102, no. 49, Database accession no. (M - 511), & JP61079041 A 19860422 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0556415 | JPH0222254 |